EP1333316 - SOLID STATE ELECTROCHROMIC ELEMENT AND MIRROR DEVICE AND CRT DISPLAY COMPRISING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murakami Corporation 12-25, Miyamoto-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka, 422-8569 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Murakami Corporation 12-25, Miyamoto-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka, 422-8569 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCHIZUKA, Takuo 143, Kanaya-cho Shitoro Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 428-0016 / JP | 02 /
TERADA, Yoshiyuki 1-4-33-106, Takaoka Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka 426-0062 / JP | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2003/32] | Application number, filing date | 01967823.4 | 25.09.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001JP08297 | Priority number, date | JP20000342918 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000342918 | [2003/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0239180 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1333316 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/153, G02F1/155, G02F1/161 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
H04N5/72 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/155 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/153 (EP,US);
G02F1/161 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/65 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | G02F1/15, G02F1/155 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHROMES ELEMENT AUF FESTKÖRPERBASIS UND SPIEGELEINRICHTUNG SOWIE EIN SIE UMFASSENDES CRT-DISPLAY | [2003/32] | English: | SOLID STATE ELECTROCHROMIC ELEMENT AND MIRROR DEVICE AND CRT DISPLAY COMPRISING IT | [2003/32] | French: | ELEMENT ELECTROCHROMIQUE TRANSISTORE ET DISPOSITIF A MIROIR, ET ECRAN CATHODIQUE LES INTEGRANT | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2002 | Translation filed | 29.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.09.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2003 | 29.09.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2003 | 29.09.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2003 | 29.09.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.09.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   29.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6338923 ; | [A]JPH02127620 ; | [Y]US5187607 (ENDO TATSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 28 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9314436 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * page 4, line 17 - line 22 * * page 7, line 17 - line 25 * * page 19, line 1 - line 6 *; | [A]EP0950568 (MURAKAMI KAIMEIDO KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] ** figure 3 *; | [Y]WO0036629 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 5,6 * page 2, line 5 - line 18 * * page 3, line 11 - line 14 * * figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880714), vol. 012, no. 249, Database accession no. (P - 730), & JP63038923 A 19880219 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900730), vol. 014, no. 352, Database accession no. (P - 1085), & JP02127620 A 19900516 (OPTREX CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO9938049 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [A]JPH10253995 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JPH03157625 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JPH05142585 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) |