EP1313815 - PAINT STRIPPING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTSMAN PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION 7114 North Lamar Boulevard Austin Texas 78752 / US | [2006/19] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states HUNTSMAN PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION 7114 North Lamar Boulevard Austin, Texas 78752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHAC, James, R., Jr. 126, North Misty Dawn Drive The Woodlands, TX 77385 / US | 02 /
MARQUIS, Edward, T. 9004 Collinfield Drive Austin, TX 78758 / US | 03 /
WOODRUM, Susan, A. 1325 Solitaire Round Rock, TX 78664 / US | [2003/29] |
Former [2003/22] | 01 /
MACHAC, James, R., Jr. 20702 Southridge Lago Vista, TX 78645 / US | ||
02 /
MARQUIS, Edward, T. 9004 Collinfield Drive Austin, TX 78758 / US | |||
03 /
WOODRUM, Susan, A. 1325 Solitaire Round Rock, TX 78664 / US | Representative(s) | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Winkler, Andreas, Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01968303.6 | 30.08.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001US27053 | Priority number, date | US20000654439 | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 654439 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0218503 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1313815 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1313815 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D9/00 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C09D9/00 (EP,US);
C11D3/3947 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
C11D7/5022 (EP,US);
C11D7/263 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABBEIZZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2003/22] | English: | PAINT STRIPPING COMPOSITIONS | [2003/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE DECAPAGE DE PEINTURE | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2006 | BE | 10.05.2006 | CH | 10.05.2006 | CY | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | FR | 10.05.2006 | IT | 10.05.2006 | LI | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | TR | 10.05.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | DE | 11.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | ES | 21.08.2006 | GB | 30.08.2006 | IE | 30.08.2006 | LU | 30.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
TR | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
DE | 11.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
LU | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
DE | 11.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
DE | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
GB | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
DE | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
DE | 11.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 10.08.2006 | |
ES | 21.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9729158 (DASIC INTERNATIONAL LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]US6040284 (MARQUIS EDWARD T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-19,24-33,38-41 * column 3, lines 25-29 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 10; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [PX]WO0063304 (HUNTSMAN SPEC CHEM CORP [US]) [PX] 1-3,8-19,24-33,38-41 * page 6, paragraph 2; claim - *; | [PX]WO0142376 (HUNTSMAN SPEC CHEM CORP [US]) [PX] 1-3,8-19,24-33,38-41 * page 5, lines 30,31; claim - * |