EP1337785 - DO-IT-YOURSELF LAMPSHADE KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sviland, Elen 252 Barrow Street Jersey City, NY 07302 / US | [2003/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2003/35] | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01968370.5 | 31.08.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001US27236 | Priority number, date | US20000652338 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: US 652338 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0218838 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1337785 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F21V1/16, F21V1/26 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
F21V1/16 (EP,US);
F21V1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUSATZ ZUM SELBERMACHEN VON EINEM LAMPENSCHIRM | [2003/35] | English: | DO-IT-YOURSELF LAMPSHADE KIT | [2003/35] | French: | ABAT-JOUR A ASSEMBLER SOI-MEME | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 27.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2004 | 31.08.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2005 | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2007 | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYA]US86987 (A.D. LAWS) [DY] 1,3,4,7,10 * the whole document * [A] 11,15,19,20; | [A]US780875 (DUNCAN SYLENA A [US]) [A] 1,11,15,19,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US3275821 (LEBB WALTER J) [A] 1,19* the whole document *; | [DA]US4268896 (MANN RAY R) [DA] 1,11,15,19,20 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [YA]DE29708838U (HENKELS JOCHEN DIPL DESIGNER [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,7,10 * page 2, line 16 - line 36 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 33 * * page 9, line 24 - line 34 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 3 * * figures 10,13 * [A] 11,15,19,20; | [A]DE29814542U (SCHLEGEL MARC [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,6,11,15,19,20 * page 2, line 4 - line 23 * * page 3, line 20 - line 24 * * page 4, line 32 - line 35 * * page 5, line 13 - line 34 * * page 6, line 33 - line 36 * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US86987 | US103928 | US1309263 | US1477991 | US1813492 | US3582643 | US4176529 | US4278896 | US4688155 | US4747031 |