EP1312218 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF CREATING ENHANCEMENT CONTENT TO BE DISPLAYED WITH A TELEVISION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OpenTV, Inc. 275 Sacramento Street San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | [2011/40] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Intellocity USA, Inc. 1400 Market Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKEL, Steven, O. 3031 E. Wyecliff Way Highlands Ranch, CO 80126 / US | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Nagravision SA KIPI Departement Rte de Genève 22-24 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile, et al Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2004/24] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/21] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01968961.1 | 27.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001US41894 | Priority number, date | US20000227930P | 25.08.2000 Original published format: US 227930 P | US20000227918P | 25.08.2000 Original published format: US 227918 P | US20010935492 | 23.08.2001 Original published format: US 935492 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0217642 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1312218 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H04N21/854 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2355 (EP,US);
H04N21/25808 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04N21/643 (EP,US);
H04N21/658 (EP,US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04N21/8545 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N7/088 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ERWEITERTEM INHALT ZUR DARSTELLUNG MIT EINEM FERNSEHPROGRAMM | [2003/21] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF CREATING ENHANCEMENT CONTENT TO BE DISPLAYED WITH A TELEVISION PROGRAM | [2003/21] | French: | AMELIORATION POUR TELEVISION | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 06.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 31.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2327837 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,11,12,16,18,20,22,23 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - line 12 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 5 * * page 8, line 17 - line 20 * * page 13, line 3 - page 16, line 6 * * page 17, line 18 - line 19 * * page 18, line 8 - line 14 * * claims 1-3,5,6,11,16,17,20,24,25,28,32,33,36,40-43,45-47 * * figures 4,5 *; | [X]US5600775 (KING PHILIP S [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 36 * * column 4, line 20 - line 35 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 6 * * column 6, line 19 - line 29 * * column 9, line 39 - line 53 * * claims 1,6-11,15-19,21,25,28,30-35,39-45 * * figure 2 *; | [XY]WO9935832 (AMIGA DEV LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,10-12,19-22 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - line 25 * * page 6, line 23 - line 31 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 3 * * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 28 * * page 11, line 3 - line 27 * * claims 1,2,4,10,12,13,15,16 * * figures 3-7 * [Y] 28; | [Y]WO0049520 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [Y] 13 * page 2, line 13 - line 20 *; | [XY] - SHIM S S Y ET AL, "TEMPLATE BASED SYNCHRONIZED MULTIMEDIA INTEGRATION LANGUAGE AUTHORING TOOL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (200001), vol. 3964, pages 134 - 142, XP000986660 [X] 1-5,8-12,14,15,17,19-21,24,27 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,13,25,26,28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.373449 | [Y] - "MPEG-4 Authoring Tools Let Pros, Consumers Create Multimedia for Web Pages, TV, HDTV", SNARNOFF DOCUMENT, (19981210), XP002155140 [Y] 6,7,25,26 * the whole document * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "HTML 4.0 Specification", W3C RECOMMENDATION, (19980424), XP002191626 [A] 10,21 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0849946 |