EP1305036 - NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2010/43] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCHAT, Florence Quartier des Tilleuls 6 CH-1820 Montreux / CH | 02 /
BALLEVRE, Olivier 16B, route de Cojonnex CH-1000 Lausanne 25 / CH | 03 /
JANN, Alfred 255, rte de Pays de Gavot F-74500 Publier / FR | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Brearley, Helen Rebecca, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Brearley, Helen Rebecca, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2004/05] | Thomas, Alain, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2003/18] | Wavre, Claude-Alain, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 01969415.7 | 17.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001EP08283 | Priority number, date | EP20000115850 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: EP 00115850 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0207533 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1305036 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1305036 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K31/715, A23L1/053, A23L1/0522, A23L1/308, A23L1/0528 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A23L33/125 (EP,KR,US);
A23L29/244 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A23L29/25 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A23L29/30 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/22 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/715, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2200/3202, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/5022 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2200/3202, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/5118 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2200/3202, A23V2250/5022, A23V2250/5062 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2200/3202, A23V2250/5062, A23V2250/5118 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/5022, A23V2250/5118 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5022, A23V2250/5062, A23V2250/5118 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERNÄHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2003/18] | English: | NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION | [2003/18] | French: | COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.04.2010 | 15.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10161205.9 / EP2204176 | EP10176464.5 / EP2255815 | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | IE | 17.07.2011 | LU | 17.07.2011 | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/25] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
IE | 17.07.2011 | ||
LU | 17.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
IE | 17.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 27.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5444054 (GARLEB KEITH A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-14 * tables 6,13,14 * * claims 1,7,10,13 *; | [X]EP0756828 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [X] 1,6-14 * example 1; claims 1,4-6 * * column 3, line 31 - line 44 *; | [A]US5721004 (JAMES SHERIANNE M [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8 * claims 1,4,5,9 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 23 *; | [A]EP0850569 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,2,6,8 * claims 1,5-8 * * page 3, line 17 - line 25 * * page 5, line 4 - line 7 * * page 7, line 31 - line 33; example 5 *; | [A] - GIBSON G R ET AL, "DIETARY MODULATION OF THE HUMAN COLONIC MICROBIOTA: INTRODUCING THE CONCEPT OF PREBIOTICS", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION,WISTAR INSTITUTE OF ANATOMY AND BIOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA,,US, (199506), vol. 125, no. 6, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 1401 - 1412, XP000972244 [A] 1-14 * page 1410, column L * | by applicant | EP0756828 |