EP1332621 - TRANSMITTING AND PROCESSING PROTECTED CONTENT IN A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2016/16] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states THOMSON Licensing S.A. 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Canal+ Technologies Société Anonyme 34 Place Raoul Dautry 75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPORINI, David Canal+ Tech. S.A. 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | 02 /
DUBLANCHET, Frederic Canal+ Technologies S.A. 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | 03 /
SURCOUF, Andre Canal+ Technologies S.A. 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | 04 /
GAUDE, Nicolas Canal+ Technologies S.A. 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | 05 /
DELAUNAY, Eric Canal+ Technologies S.A. 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [2016/16] |
Former [2003/32] | 01 /
LEPORINI, David Canal+ Tech. S.A., 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | ||
02 /
DUBLANCHET, Frederic Canal+ Technologies S.A., 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | |||
03 /
SURCOUF, Andre Canal+ Technologies S.A., 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | |||
04 /
GAUDE, Nicolas Canal+ Technologies S.A., 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | |||
05 /
DELAUNAY, Eric Canal+ Technologies S.A., 34 Place Raoul Dautry F-75906 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Representative(s) | Kohrs, Martin TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Kohrs, Martin Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [N/P] | Kohrs, Martin Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/38] | Kohrs, Martin Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/32] | Stankoff, Hélène (FR) Rinuy, Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 F-75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01970094.7 | 24.08.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001IB01845 | Priority number, date | EP20000402349 | 24.08.2000 Original published format: EP 00402349 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0217635 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1332621 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1332621 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/8355, H04N21/4623, H04N21/4627, H04N21/433, H04N5/913, H04N7/167, H04N7/16, H04N21/254, H04N21/4408, H04N21/266 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/26606 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/4408 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | H04N7/167 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG UND VERARBEITUNG GESCHÜTZTER INHALTE IN EINEM ZUGRIFFSSYSTEM MIT BEDINGTEM ZUGRIFF | [2003/32] | English: | TRANSMITTING AND PROCESSING PROTECTED CONTENT IN A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM | [2003/32] | French: | TRANSMISSION ET TRAITEMENT DE CONTENU PROTEGE | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 03.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | GB | 24.08.2016 | IE | 24.08.2016 | LU | 24.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/41] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
GB | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 24.08.2016 | ||
LU | 24.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
NL | 20.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2732537 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [DA] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * abstract *; | [A]WO9843426 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, line 13 - line 18 * * page 11, line 17 - page 15, line 5 *; | [A]US5845281 (BENSON GREG [SE], et al) [A] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * abstract * * figures 1,9 * * column 3, line 10 - line 38 * * column 5, line 23 - line 46 * * column 7, line 15 - line 25 * * column 8, paragraph L * * column 10, line 42 - line 44 * * column 15, line 8 - line 13 * * column 16, line 26 - line 43 *; | [X]WO9907148 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [X] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - line 24 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 4 * * page 21, paragraph 2 - page 25, paragraph 1; figure 6 * * page 28, line 28 - page 29, line 5 * * page 28, paragraph 3 - page 32, paragraph L; figures 7-11 *; | [A]EP0898425 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 10 * * column 5, line 3 * * column 5, paragraph 18 - column 6 * * column 6, line 37 - line 41 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 7 * * column 7, line 25 * * column 7, line 54 - line 57 * * column 8, line 15 - line 17 * * column 8, paragraph 32; figures 3,5,6; claims 4,9 *; | [A]WO9945711 (NDS LTD [GB]) [A] 26-33,61-67,95-101,103 * abstract ** page 5, paragraph L *; | [A]WO9953689 (DIGITAL VIDEO EXPRESS LP [US], et al) [A] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * abstract * * page 10, line 2 - line 5 * * page 10, line 15 - line 17 * * page 11, line 11 - line 16 * * page 13, line 4 - line 11 * * figures 2,9; claims 1,16-20,22 *; | [A]US6005938 (BANKER ROBERT O [US], et al) [A] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * column 6, line 28 - column 7, paragraph 1; figure 6 *; | [A]US6005631 (ANDERSON BRUCE A [US], et al) [A] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 10 * * column 2, line 17 - line 20 *; | [A]WO0004688 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 26-33,61-67,95-101,103 * page 11, line 5 - page 15, line 11 *; | [XA]US6104860 (LEE CHUEN-CHIEN [US], et al) [X] 26-33,61-67,95-101,103 * column 3, line 2 - line 8 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 20 * * column 12, line 51 - column 13, line 14 * * column 13, line 51 - line 54 * [A] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118; | [A] - "FUNCTIONAL MODEL OF A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19951221), no. 266, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 64 - 77, XP000559450 [A] 1-25,34-60,68-94,102,104-118 * the whole document * | Examination | US5799081 | - "FUNCTIONAL MODEL OF A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19951221), no. 266, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 64 - 77, XP000559450 |