EP1336845 - METHOD OF DIAGNOSING NEPHROPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENKA SEIKEN Co., Ltd. 4-2, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0025 / JP | [2013/13] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states DENKA SEIKEN Co., Ltd. 4-2, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0025 / JP | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Hara, Masanori 31-30, Sakaihigashi 5-chome Niigata-shi, Niigata 950-2041 / JP | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL REAGENTS CORPORATION 1-30, Hamabe-dori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0083 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Masanori 31-30, Sakaihigashi 5-chome Niigata-shi, Niigata 950-2041 / JP | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Lieck, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01970277.8 | 28.09.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001JP08512 | Priority number, date | JP20000329102 | 27.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000329102 | [2003/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0237099 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1336845 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1336845 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/493, G01N33/53 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2333/705 (EP,US);
G01N2800/347 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/34] | Title | German: | NEPHROPATHIEDIAGNOSEVERFAHREN | [2003/34] | English: | METHOD OF DIAGNOSING NEPHROPATHY | [2003/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA NEPHROPATHIE | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2003 | Translation filed | 29.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.2013 | BE | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | IE | 28.09.2013 | LU | 28.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 27.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0611507 ; | [X]EP0514928 (WAKAMOTO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,12 * abstract *; | [X]US5654158 (MCDONALD THOMAS L [US]) [X] 1-5,12 * column 20 - column 22 *; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940414), vol. 018, no. 211, Database accession no. (P - 1726), & JP06011507 A 19940121 (FUJIREBIO INC) [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * [A] 4,12 | [X] - HARA MASANORI ET AL, "Urinary excretion of podocalyxin indicates glomerular epithelial cell injuries in glomerulonephritis", NEPHRON, (1995), vol. 69, no. 4, ISSN 0028-2766, pages 397 - 403, XP009065517 [X] 1-9,12 * page 398 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000188509 | [XDA] - HARA MASANORI ET AL, "Urinary excretion of podocytes reflects disease activity in children with glomerulonephritis", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF NEPHROLOGY, (199801), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0250-8095, pages 35 - 41, XP009065519 [XD] 1-3,5-9 * page 35 - page 37 * [A] 4,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000013302 | [XA] - NAKAMURA TSUKASA ET AL, "Urinary excretion of podocytes in patients with diabetic nephropathy", NEPHROLOGY DIALYSIS TRANSPLANTATION, (200009), vol. 15, no. 9, ISSN 0931-0509, pages 1379 - 1383, XP009065526 [X] 1-9 * page 1379 - page 1380 * [A] 4,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ndt/15.9.1379 | [XA] - YUAN HUAIPING ET AL, "Altered distribution of nephrin in experimental membranous nephropathy", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, & 33RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY AND THE 2000 RENAL WEEK; TORONTO, ONTARIO, CANADA; OCTOBER 10-16, 2000, (200009), vol. 11, no. Program and Abstract Issue, ISSN 1046-6673, pages 522A - 523A, XP009065520 [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * [A] 4,12 | [XA] - NAKAMURA TSUKASA ET AL, "Urinary podocytes for the assessment of disease activity in lupus nephritis", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF THE MEDICAL SCIENCES, (200008), vol. 320, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9629, pages 112 - 116, XP009065518 [X] 1-3,5-9 * page 112 - page 113 * [A] 4,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00000441-200008000-00009 | International search | [X]WO9708549 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO0052023 (BIOSTRATUM INC [US], et al); | [Y]JPH0611507 (FUJIREBIO KK); | [Y]JPS61145459 (BEHRINGWERKE AG) |