EP1331493 - RADIATION DETECTING DEVICE FOR NUCLEAR MEDICINE DIAGNOSIS DEVICE AND DETECTING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Koichi 15-1, Nakano 3-chome Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-0001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAYAMA, Takuzo, K. K. TOSHIBA, NASU KOJO 1385-1, Aza Higashiyama, Shimoishigami Ohtawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01970329.7 | 01.10.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001JP08656 | Priority number, date | JP20000304705 | 04.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000304705 | [2003/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0229438 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331493 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
G01T1/2985 (EP,US);
G01T1/161 (KR);
A61B6/4258 (EP,US);
A61B6/037 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/31] | G01T1/161 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRAHLUNGSDETEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE NUKLEARMEDIZIN-DIAGNOSEEINRICHTUNG UND DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2003/31] | English: | RADIATION DETECTING DEVICE FOR NUCLEAR MEDICINE DIAGNOSIS DEVICE AND DETECTING METHOD THEREFOR | [2003/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE RAYONNEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC DE MEDECINE NUCLEAIRE ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION ASSOCIE | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2003 | Translation filed | 25.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 28.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 02.06.2015 | Appeal received No. T1606/15 | 03.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.07.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP16198722.7 / EP3153889 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2759837 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15,16 * page 4, line 16 - page 12, line 16; figure 2c * [Y] 6,14; | [X]JPH07104072 (SHIMADZU CORP) [X] 1,9 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2231474 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [Y] 6,14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0637759 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 2,10 * page 1, line 7 - line 32 *; | [A]WO9708569 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB], et al) [A] 2,10 * page 12, line 6 - line 14 * | International search | [Y]JPH11304926 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH11337647 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]WO9309447 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) | by applicant | US6329658 | JPH07104072B |