EP1417573 - METHOD FOR REMOTE INCREMENTAL PROGRAM VERIFICATION AND INSTALLATION ON RESOURCE-CONSTRAINED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWABE, Judith E. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London, EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01970946.8 | 14.09.2001 | [2004/20] | WO2001US28687 | Priority number, date | US20000661581 | 14.09.2000 Original published format: US 661581 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0225427 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1417573 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2004/20] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE SCHRITTWEISE FERNÜBERPRÜFUNG EINES PROGRAMMS UND DIE INSTALLATION AUF GERÄTEN MIT BESCHRÄNKTEN BETRIEBSMITTELN | [2004/20] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOTE INCREMENTAL PROGRAM VERIFICATION AND INSTALLATION ON RESOURCE-CONSTRAINED DEVICES | [2004/20] | French: | PEUPLEMENT DE DISPOSITIFS A RESSOURCES LIMITEES A COMPATIBILITE BINAIRE AVEC CONTENU VERIFIE PAR DEFINITIONS API | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.03.2003 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/32] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0292248 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC) [X] 1-8,45,58 * column 4, line 12 - line 21 *; | [X]WO9852158 (MONDEX INT LTD) [X] 1-8,45,58 * page 3, line 16 - page 7, line L *; | [X]WO0025278 (GUNGL KLAUS P ; WENTKER DAVID C (US); VISA INT SERVICE ASS (US)) [X] 9-26,46-52,59-63,72-74 * page 16, line 29 - page 28, line 14 *; | [X]EP0778520 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC) [X] 27-44,53-57,64-68,75-77 * page 6, line 42 - page 7, line 9 *; | [X]WO0046666 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC) [X] 69-71 * abstract * |