EP1317265 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING NEURONAL DISEASES AND FOR TREATING PRIMARY HEMOSTASIS DEFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX-DELBRÜCK-CENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTHER, Diego Florastrasse 2 13187 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BADER, Michael Strasse 45, Nr. 35 13125 Berlin / DE | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Krauss, Jan B., Dr. Forrester & Boehmert, Meinekestrasse 26 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01971618.2 | 27.08.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001DE03178 | Priority number, date | DE2000143124 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10043124 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0217891 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1317265 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/405, A61P37/00, A61K45/06 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
A61K49/0004 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4353 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4353, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/436, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/13, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/24] | A61K31/405 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSTIK VON NEURONALEN ERKRANKUNGEN SOWIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER DEFIZIENTEN PRIMÄREN HÄMOSTASE | [2003/24] | English: | METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING NEURONAL DISEASES AND FOR TREATING PRIMARY HEMOSTASIS DEFICIENCY | [2003/24] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER DES MALADIES NEURONALES ET POUR TRAITER L'HEMOSTASE PRIMAIRE DEFICIENTE | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/44] | 18.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2105192 (COUGHLIN SHAUN R [US]) [X] 1 *siehe Zusammenfassung, Seite 1, Zeilen 43-51, 61-65, Seite 2, Zeilen 1-10, sowie Zeilen 61-65 mit Seite 3, Zeilen 1-6*; | [X]US3686414 (KOE BILLIE KENNETH) [X] 1 *siehe Spalte 1, Zeilen 7-15 und Zeilen 44-56, Spalte 2, Zeilen 45-68*; | [X]US4994475 (GITTOS MAURICE W [FR]) [X] 1 *siehe Zusammenfassung, Spalte 2, Zeilen 32-66, Spalte 3, Zeilen 39-58* |