EP1309955 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF AN ELECTRONIC SUM OF MONEY FROM A CREDIT RESERVE BY WAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JASCHHOF, Rainer Charn Issara Tower II, 20th Floor 10320 Bangkok, Bangkapi / TH | 02 /
WOLF, Hans-Hermann Leonhardiweg 45a 81829 München / DE | [2003/26] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
JASCHHOF, Rainer Graf-Toerring-Str.12 82216 Gernlinden / DE | ||
02 /
WOLF, Hans-Hermann Leonhardiweg 45a 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01971898.0 | 02.08.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001EP09216 | Priority number, date | EP20000117810 | 18.08.2000 Original published format: EP 00117810 | [2003/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0217258 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1309955 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/223 (EP,US);
G06Q20/28 (EP,US);
G06Q20/32 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3223 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN GELDBETRAGES AUS EINEM GUTHABENSPEICHER PER WAP | [2003/20] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF AN ELECTRONIC SUM OF MONEY FROM A CREDIT RESERVE BY WAP | [2003/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE UNE SOMME D'ARGENT ELECTRONIQUE A PARTIR D'UN SYSTEME D'ENREGISTREMENT D'AVOIR PAR WAP | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5613012 (HOFFMAN NED [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * figures 1-4; claims 1-38 *; | [A]US5905736 (RONEN YZHAK [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 23 - column 6, line 51 *; | [A]DE19903363 (MUELLER JUDEX DONALD [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,8,10,11,14 * the whole document *; | [A] - SELLIN R, "NEUE MOBILE PERSPEKTIVEN MIT WAP", NTZ NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, (1999), vol. 52, no. 11, ISSN 0027-707X, pages 50 - 53, XP000868398 | [A] - N. LEAVITT, "WILL WAP DELIVER THE WIRELESS INTERNET ?", COMPUTER, (200005), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 16 - 20, XP002158269 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MC.2000.841780 | [A] - VAN THANH D, "Security issues in mobile ecommerce", PROCEEDINGS 11TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, PROCEEDINGS 11TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, LONDON, UK, 4-8 SEPT. 2000, 2000, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, ISBN 0-7695-0680-1, pages 412 - 425, XP002158270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DEXA.2000.875060 | Examination | WO9908238 | EP0986275 |