EP1218648 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BRAKE SHOE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMD Friction GmbH Schlebuscher Strasse 99 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2002/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIATEREK, Christian Zum Wirtsspezarder Hof 1 51519 Odenthal / DE | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Müller, Eckhard, et al Mühlstrasse 9a 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | [2008/44] |
Former [2006/16] | Müller, Eckhard, et al Dr. Müller + Partner Patentanwälte Mühlstrasse 9 a 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01971900.4 | 10.08.2001 | [2002/27] | WO2001EP09249 | Priority number, date | DE2000141308 | 23.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10041308 | [2002/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216795 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1218648 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1218648 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/04 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
F16D65/092 (EP,US);
F16D2069/002 (EP,US);
F16D2069/004 (EP,US);
F16D2069/007 (EP,US);
F16D2069/045 (EP,US);
F16D2069/0491 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BREMSBACKE | [2002/27] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BRAKE SHOE | [2002/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN SEGMENT DE FREIN | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 10.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | IT | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
SE | 27.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5141083 (BURGOON DONALD L [US]) [A] 1,5,6,9 * column 4, line 34 - line 41 * * figures 3,4,4A *; | [A]DE4431642 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * column 8, line 46 - line 67 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0745781 (TEXTAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 39 *; | [A]DE19543329 (FRIMATEC INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1,4* claim 8 * |