EP1334054 - PRODUCTION LINE FOR FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Järvenkylä, Mikael Helteentie 10 D 04600 Mäntsälä / FI | [2003/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2006/10] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 12 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2005/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/21] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2003/33] | Westerholm, Carl Christian Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01972117.4 | 24.09.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001FI00833 | Priority number, date | FI20000002098 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: FI 20002098 | FI20000002099 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: FI 20002099 | [2003/33] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0224555 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1334054 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1334054 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/52, B65G21/06 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
A21C9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERTINGUNGSSTRASSE FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTELPRODUKTE | [2003/33] | English: | PRODUCTION LINE FOR FOOD PRODUCTS | [2003/33] | French: | CHAINE DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2002 | Translation filed | 24.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 24.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 16.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | BE | 15.03.2006 | CH | 15.03.2006 | CY | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | LI | 15.03.2006 | TR | 15.03.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | PT | 16.08.2006 | LU | 24.09.2006 | IE | 25.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
TR | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LU | 24.09.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4146126 (MATTOS DAVID W); | [A]FR2678484 (LAVAL JEAN LUC [FR], et al); | [A]US5657529 (BOHN MARTIN [DE], et al) |