EP1322290 - VACCINE COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN IMMUNOLOGICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCE EMBEDDED IN MICROPARTICLES CONSISTING OF STARCH WITH REDUCED MOLECULAR WEIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAGOTEC AG Eptingerstrasse 51 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2003/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÖNSSON, Monica Sigvard Grubbes gata 1 S-230 40 Bara / SE | 02 /
LARSSON, Karin Prästavägen 2 S-240 12 Torna Hällestad / SE | 03 /
GUSTAFSSON, Nils, Ove Hippodromvägen 7 S-246 50 Löddeköpinge / SE | 04 /
LAAKSO, Timo 2 Rectory Road, Campton Bedfordshire SG 17 S PF / GB | 05 /
RESLOW, Mats Bondvägen 45 S-227 38 Lund / SE | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2003/27] | Larsson, Kjell AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01972895.5 | 05.10.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001SE02169 | Priority number, date | SE20000003615 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: SE 0003615 | US20010260455P | 08.01.2001 Original published format: US 260455 P | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0228371 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322290 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/50 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
B01J13/22 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/5073 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P33/12 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 28.03.2003 | LV | 28.03.2003 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAKZINZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS EINER IMMUNOLOGISCH AKTIVEN SUBSTANZ, DIE IN MIKROPARTIKELN AUS STÄRKE MIT REDUZIERTEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT EINGEBETTET IST | [2003/27] | English: | VACCINE COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN IMMUNOLOGICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCE EMBEDDED IN MICROPARTICLES CONSISTING OF STARCH WITH REDUCED MOLECULAR WEIGHT | [2003/27] | French: | COMPOSITION DE VACCIN RENFERMANT UNE SUBSTANCE IMMUNOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVE LOGEE DANS DES MICROPARTICULES FAITES D'UN AMIDON AU POIDS MOLECULAIRE REDUIT | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 13.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/26] | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4713249 (SCHROEDER ULF [SE]); | [X]WO9522318 (MODI PANKAJ [CA]); | [X]WO9901214 (INST VOOR AGROTECH ONDERZOEK [NL], et al) |