EP1317541 - ISOLATED HUMAN TRANSPORTER PROTEINS, NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING HUMAN TRANSPORTER PROTEINS, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applera Corporation 301 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states APPLERA CORPORATION 301 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states PE Corporation (NY) 761 Main Avenue Norwalk, CT 06859-0199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEASLEY, Ellen, c/o Celera Genomics Corporation 45West Gude Drive C2-4 20 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 02 /
YAN, Chunhua, c/o Celera Genomics Corporation 45 West Gude Drive C2-4 20 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
CHANDRAMOULISWARAN, Ishwar, Celera Genomics Corp 45 West Gude Drive C2-4 20 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 04 /
GAN, Weiniu, c/o Celera Genomics Corporation 45 West Gude Drive C2-4 20 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 05 /
BONAZZI, Vivien, c/o Celera Genomics Corporation 45 West Gude Drive C2-4 20 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01972977.1 | 12.09.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001US28312 | Priority number, date | US20000231572P | 11.09.2000 Original published format: US 231572 P | US20010949654 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: US 949654 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0220764 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1317541 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, G01N33/68, A01K67/027 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
C07K14/70571 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE HUMANE TRANSPORTERPROTEINE, DAFÜR KODIERENDE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2003/24] | English: | ISOLATED HUMAN TRANSPORTER PROTEINS, NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING HUMAN TRANSPORTER PROTEINS, AND USES THEREOF | [2003/24] | French: | PROTEINES TRANSPORTEUSES HUMAINES ISOLEES, MOLECULES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CODANT LESDITES PROTEINES, ET UTILISATION DESDITES PROTEINES | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5643785 (KAMBOJ RAJENDER [CA], et al) [X] 1-16,19-23 * the whole document *; | [X] - FLETCHER E J ET AL, "Cloning, expression and pharmacological characterization of a human glutamate receptor: hGluR4", RECEPTORS AND CHANNELS, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, CH, (1995), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1060-6823, pages 21 - 31, XP002123514 [X] 1-16,19-23 * the whole document * | [A] - LEMIEUX B ET AL, "OVERVIEW OF DNA CHIP TECHNOLOGY", MOLECULAR BREEDING: NEW STRATEGIES IN PLANT IMPROVEMENT, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NL, (1998), vol. 4, ISSN 1380-3743, pages 277 - 289, XP000915221 [A] 6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1009654300686 |