EP1354231 - CABLE REPEATER CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc. 10 Park Avenue Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2003/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORDAHI, Maurice 49 Valley Drive Atlantic Highlands, NJ 07716 / US | 02 /
GIRZONE, William 203 Lake Avenue Saratoga Springs, NY 12866 / US | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
KORDAHI, Maurice 49 Valley Drive Atlantic Highlands, NJ 07716 / US | ||
02 /
GIRZONE, William Apartment 19 510 Ocean Avenue Bradley Beach, NJ 07720 / US | Representative(s) | Weitzel, David Stanley Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Weitzel, David Stanley Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01973526.5 | 26.09.2001 | [2003/43] | WO2001US30034 | Priority number, date | US20010766704 | 22.01.2001 Original published format: US 766704 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02059664 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1354231 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1354231 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/24 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/3829 (EP,US);
G02B6/38875 (EP,US);
G02B6/4461 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/25] |
Former [2003/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KABELVERSTÄRKERVERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG | [2003/43] | English: | CABLE REPEATER CONNECTOR | [2003/43] | French: | JOINT DE RACCORDEMENT DE REPETEUR DE CABLE | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JPH10260331 ; | [Y]JPS5486794 | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10260331 A 19980929 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,8-10,12-17,19-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0012] , [0051] - [0065]; figures 8,9 * [A] 7,11,18 [Y] 2-6 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790914), vol. 003, no. 110, Database accession no. (E - 137), & JP54086794 A 19790710 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [Y] 2-6 * abstract * |