EP1438854 - SMARTCARD UART FOR MINIMIZING PROCESSOR DEMANDS IN A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFFIELD, David, Jay 5459 Fall Creek Road Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | 02 /
COOPER, Jeffrey, Allen 11 Toth Lane Rocky Hill, NJ 08553 / US | 03 /
NARASIMHAN, Mohan 504 Deacon Street Carmel, IN 46032 / US | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/35] | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Etienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/30] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson, 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01975586.7 | 28.09.2001 | [2004/30] | WO2001US30544 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03030539 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1438854 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N5/00 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
H04N7/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIPKARTE UART ZUR MINIMIERUNG VON PROZESSORBEDARF IN EINEM SYSTEM MIT BEDINGTEM ZUGANG | [2004/30] | English: | SMARTCARD UART FOR MINIMIZING PROCESSOR DEMANDS IN A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM | [2004/30] | French: | UART DE CARTE A MEMOIRE SERVANT A REDUIRE AU MINIMUM LES DEMANDES DE PROCESSEUR DANS UN SYSTEME D'ACCES CONDITIONNEL | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9632702 (SMART TV CO [US]) [Y] 1-22 * page 5, line 4 - line 29 * * figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US6263396 (COTTLE TEMPLE D [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * column 57, line 40 - line 44 * * column 87, line 65 - column 97, line 27 * |