EP1330421 - FIBER CEMENT COMPOSITE MATERIALS USING CELLULOSE FIBERS LOADED WITH INORGANIC AND/OR ORGANIC SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states James Hardie Technology Limited Clarendon House, 2 Church Street Hamilton, HM 11 / BM | [2010/30] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states James Hardie International Finance B.V. Atrium Building 8th Floor Strawinskylaan 3077 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states James Hardie International Finance B.V. Atrium Building 8th Floor Strawinskylaan 3007 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states James Hardie International Finance B.V. Unit 04-07, Atrium Building, Strawinskylaan 3077 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states James Hardie Research Pty Limited Level 1, Research & Product, Development Building, 10 Colquhoun Street Rosehill, NSW 2142 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERKLEY, Donald, J. 5054 Klusman Avenue Alta Loma, CA 91737 / US | 02 /
LUO, Caidian 10180 Northridge Drive Alta Loma, CA 91737 / US | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Lenney, James Patrick, et al James Hardie Technology Limited Europa House, 2nd Floor, Harcourt Centre Harcourt Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/41] | Schupfner, Georg, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01975765.7 | 21.09.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001US42243 | Priority number, date | US20000237850P | 04.10.2000 Original published format: US 237850 P | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0228796 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1330421 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
C04B20/0056 (EP,US);
C04B16/02 (KR);
C04B18/24 (EP,US);
C04B20/1051 (EP,US);
C04B20/107 (EP,US);
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
D21H21/16 (EP,US);
C04B2103/65 (EP,US);
C04B2111/12 (EP,US);
C04B2111/27 (EP,US);
D21H17/13 (EP,US);
D21H17/59 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B18/24, C04B20/0056, C04B20/02 (US,EP);
C04B18/24, C04B20/0056, C04B20/10 (EP,US);
C04B18/24, C04B20/02, C04B20/023, C04B20/026, C04B20/1055 (EP,US);
C04B18/24, C04B20/1018 (US,EP);
C04B18/24, C04B20/107 (US,EP);
C04B20/0056, C04B18/24, C04B20/1055 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B14/062, C04B20/002, C04B20/0048, C04B40/02, C04B40/024 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B14/06, C04B18/24, C04B18/24, C04B40/02, C04B40/024 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/06, C04B20/0052, C04B40/02, C04B40/024 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B18/24, C04B18/24, C04B20/0048, C04B40/0064, C04B40/024 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERZEMENT VERBUNDMATERIAL MIT ANORGANISCHEN UND/ODER ORGANISCHEN STOFFEN BELADENEN ZELLULOSEFASERN | [2003/31] | English: | FIBER CEMENT COMPOSITE MATERIALS USING CELLULOSE FIBERS LOADED WITH INORGANIC AND/OR ORGANIC SUBSTANCES | [2003/31] | French: | MAT RIAUX COMPOSITES AU FIBROCIMENT UTILISANT DES FIBRES DE CELLULOSE CHARG ES DE SUBSTANCES INORGANIQUES ET/OU ORGANIQUES | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 11.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Observations by third parties | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.05.2017 | 09.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/40] | 28.05.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AP]JP2001240458 ; | [A]GB1003850 (SIMONE GARNIER) [A] 1,3,6,45 * page 3, line 25 - line 39 *; | [XA]DE3601736 (FULGURIT BAUSTOFFE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,45,68 * the whole document * [A] 18; | [DA]US5223090 (KLUNGNESS JOHN H [US], et al) [DA] 1,3,4,8,10 * claim - *; | [AD]US6030447 (NAJI BASIL TAHA [AU], et al) [AD] 1,14,16-21,23,24,26,27,32,34,45,51,53,54,58,59,68* claim - *; | [AP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 12, Database accession no. 2002-085436, XP002197953 & JP2001240458 A 20010904 (KAMISHIMA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [AP] 1,3,5 * abstract * | Examination | US4486234 | EP0331666 | - "Wood fibre-reinforced cement composites", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (1980), vol. 15, pages 1962 - 1970 | other | US4486234 | EP0331666 | - M.D. CAMPBELL AND R.S.P. COUTTS, "Wood fibre-reinforced cement composites", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (1980), vol. 15, pages 1962 - 1970, XP003026690 |