EP1311238 - USE OF DI-SUGAR ALCOHOL PHOSPHATES TO PROTECT HUMAN SKIN CELLS FROM UV-AND/OR IR RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/21] | COSMETIC FORMULATION CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE DI-SUGAR ALCOHOL PHOSPHATE OF C3 TO C6 SUGAR ALCOHOLS | ||
[2009/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bitop Gesellschaft für Biotechnische Optimierung mbH Stockumer Strasse 28 58453 Witten / DE | [2009/43] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Bitop Gesellschaft für Biotechnische Optimierung mbH Stockumer Strasse 28 58453 Witten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Thomas Metzholz 33 42799 Leichlingen / DE | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Thiel, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude) 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 01976087.5 | 16.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001EP09446 | Priority number, date | DE2000140932 | 18.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10040932 | DE2000155706 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10055706 | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0215868 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1311238 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1311238 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/14, A61K8/55, A61K31/683, A61Q5/00, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
A61K8/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/683 (EP,US);
A61K8/55 (EP,US);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/522 (EP,US);
A61Q1/08 (EP,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/001 (EP,US);
A61Q19/004 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DI-ZUCKERALKOHOLPHOSPHATEN ZUM SCHUTZ MENSCHLICHER HAUTZELLEN VOR UV- UND/ODER IR-STRAHLUNG | [2009/14] | English: | USE OF DI-SUGAR ALCOHOL PHOSPHATES TO PROTECT HUMAN SKIN CELLS FROM UV-AND/OR IR RADIATION | [2009/08] | French: | UTILISATION DE DI-SUCRES DE PHOSPHATE D'ALCOOL POUR PROTEGER LES CELLULES DE LA PEAU HUMAINE CONTRE LES RADIATIONS UV ET/OU IR | [2009/08] |
Former [2003/21] | KOSMETISCHE FORMULIERUNG ENTHALTEND MINDESTENS EIN DI-ZUCKERALKOHOLPHOSPHAT VON C3 BIS C6 ZUCKERALKOHOLEN | ||
Former [2003/21] | COSMETIC FORMULATION CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE DI-SUGAR ALCOHOL PHOSPHATE OF C3 TO C6 SUGAR ALCOHOLS | ||
Former [2003/21] | FORMULATIONS COSMETIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 20.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.2004 | 31.08.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.10.2004 | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2006 | 31.08.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2007 | 31.08.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.10.2009 | DK | 21.10.2009 | FI | 21.10.2009 | IE | 21.10.2009 | NL | 21.10.2009 | SE | 21.10.2009 | TR | 21.10.2009 | GR | 22.01.2010 | PT | 22.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 21.10.2009 | |
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
NL | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 21.10.2009 | |
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 21.10.2009 | |
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | DK | 21.10.2009 | |
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 21.10.2009 | |
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]PT101813 (INST DE BIOLOG EX E TECNOLOGIC [PT]) [X] 1,2,4-19,22-27 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0965268 (IBET INST DE BIOLOG EX E TECNO [PT]) [X] 1,3-19,22-27 * column 4, lines 3-15; example 3; claims 1,2,13-15 *; | [XP]WO0076528 (BITOP GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1-19,21 * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 3, lines 5-9; claims 1-6 *; | [E]EP1125583 (BITOP GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-19,21-27 * page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, lines 22-26 *; | [E]WO0176572 (BITOP GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-19,21-27 * claims 1-11 *; | [X] - LAMOSA P ET AL, "THERMOSTABILIZATION OF PROTEINS BY DIGLYCEROL PHOSPHATE, A NEW COMPATIBLE SOLUTE FROM THE HYPERTHERMOPHILE ARCHAEOGLOBUS FULGIDUS", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, (200005), vol. 66, no. 5, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 1974 - 1979, XP001034354 [X] 1,3-19,22,24-27 * page 1976 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.66.5.1974-1979.2000 | [A] - SCHOLZ S ET AL, "DI-MYO-INOSITOL-1,1'-PHOSPHATE: A NEW INOSITOL PHOSPHATE ISOLATED FROM PYROCOCCUS WOESEI", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19920720), vol. 306, no. 2/3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 239 - 242, XP001030747 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(92)81008-A |