EP1260637 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Japan Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi Ltd. 10-1, Youga 4-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0097 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASA, Kazumichi, Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi Ltd. 10-1, Youga 4-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0097 / JP | 02 /
TSUJI, Masanori, Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi Ltd. 10-1, Youga 4-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0097 / JP | 03 /
YAMAUCHI, Y., Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi Ltd. 10-1, Youga 4-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0097 / JP | 04 /
GOTO, Takahiro, Seiryo Engineering Co., Ltd. 1-14, Wadamiyadouri 7-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0863 / JP | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01976692.2 | 16.10.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001JP09063 | Priority number, date | JP20000346642 | 14.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000346642 | [2002/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0240782 | Date: | 23.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260637 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/18 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
F02M35/164 (EP,US);
E02F9/0866 (EP,US);
E02F9/18 (EP,US);
F02M35/10157 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [2004/20] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE | [2002/48] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2002/48] | French: | ENGIN DE TERRASSEMENT | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2002 | Translation filed | 02.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09144066 (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [YA]JPH09209401 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 2 * figures 4,5,7 * [A] 1,3; | [Y]JPH11280112 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [Y] 1-3 * figure 7 *; | [Y]JP2000080676 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 1-3 * figures 1,2,4,5 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [A]JP2000080679 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1 * figures 1,4-7,9,10 *; | [A]JP2000120439 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1,2 * figures 2-6,10-12 *; | [A]JP2000120438 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1,2 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]JP2000144811 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1,2 * figures 2,7,9 *; | [A]JP2000204588 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,3,5 * | International search | [Y]JPH0455527 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09144066 (KUBOTA KK); | [Y]JPH09209401 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]JP2000080679 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]JP2000144811 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]JP2000204588 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) |