EP1322453 - SYSTEM FOR FORMING TIMBERS WITH ROUNDED ENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MiTek Holdings, Inc. Suite 1704, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington Delaware 19801-1612 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states MiTek Holdings, Inc. Suite 1704, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19801-1612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLEY, Rodger, L. 403 Trailridge Court Troy, MO 63379 / US | 02 /
TOOMBS, Eugene, IV 4 Price Court St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01977529.5 | 05.10.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001US31235 | Priority number, date | US20000238717P | 06.10.2000 Original published format: US 238717 P | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0228606 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322453 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1322453 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B27C9/00, B27M1/08, B27F1/06, B27M3/22, B27C5/06, B27C9/04, B27C5/00, B27C5/08, B27F5/02 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
B27C5/08 (EP,US);
B27C5/00 (EP,US);
B27C9/04 (EP,US);
B27F5/026 (EP,US);
B27G19/10 (EP,US);
B27M1/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | B27C9/00, B27M1/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BAUHOLZ MIT ABGERUNDETEN ENDEN | [2003/27] | English: | SYSTEM FOR FORMING TIMBERS WITH ROUNDED ENDS | [2003/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE FORMATION D'ELEMENTS DE BOIS D'OEUVRE A EXTREMITES ARRONDIES | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 22.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US726673 (GOETHE WALTER [US]) [A] 4,7,20 * figure 11 *; | [Y]US1486550 (SHERMAN WILLIS S) [Y] 23-26 * page 1, line 11 - line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE558682 (FRANZ KUHLMANN) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1881400 (EDMOND OSCAR G) [Y] 1-21,23-26 * the whole document *; | [A]CH336977 (MUELLER AG [CH]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3470924 (SHORT FRANK) [Y] 4-9 * column 2, line 29 - line 34; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3735787 (SIEL H A) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3867803 (PLATT BRUCE W) [Y] 1-21,23-26 * column 3, line 12 - line 15; figure 4 *; | [A]US4243084 (MOODY JACK M) [A] 18,19 * column 5, line 31 - line 40 * * column 5, line 64 - line 66 ** figures 1,7 *; | [X]US4907325 (HSU PEI H [TW]) [X] 10-17 * column 2, line 26 - line 30; figure - * | International search | [A]US3072159 (FRANZ WARMBRUNN); | [A]US4193431 (WOOD PAUL R [US]); | [A]US5730195 (RIESMEIER WILHELM [DE], et al) | Examination | EP0610978 | EP0739697 |