EP1339922 - HEAVE SUPPRESSED OFFSHORE DRILLING AND PRODUCTION PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2008/26] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states COFLEXIP La Defense 6 170, Place Henri Regnault 92973 Paris La Defense / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Qi 5418 Montbury Lane Katy, TX 77450 / US | 02 /
ABBOTT, Phillip, A. 20511 Manette Drive Katy, TX 77450 / US | 03 /
HALKYARD, John 14121 Cardinal Lane Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bertrand, Didier, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/36] | Bertrand, Didier, et al Cabinet FEDIT-LORIOT 38, Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01977624.4 | 10.10.2001 | [2003/36] | WO2001US31477 | Priority number, date | US20000686535 | 10.10.2000 Original published format: US 686535 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0231270 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1339922 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339922 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/00, B63B35/44 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
B63B35/4413 (EP,US);
B63B1/107 (EP,US);
B63B2001/044 (EP,US);
B63B2001/128 (EP,US);
B63B2035/442 (EP,US);
F16B21/06 (EP,US);
F16B7/0413 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OFFSHORE-BOHR UND -FÖRDERPLATTFORM MIT DÜNUNGSBEWEGUNGSUNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2003/36] | English: | HEAVE SUPPRESSED OFFSHORE DRILLING AND PRODUCTION PLATFORM | [2003/36] | French: | PLATE-FORME DE FORAGE ET DE PRODUCTION EN MER ANTI-PILONNEMENT | [2003/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS57121993 ; | [YA]FR1444039 (ZIERMANN, A) [Y] 3,4 * page 1, column 2, line 32 - page 3, column 2, line 20; figure - * [A] 21,22; | [Y]NL7606281 (IHC HOLLAND NV) [Y] 1-5,7,8,14,16,17,25-27 * figure - *; | [Y]GB2147549 (EARL & WRIGHT LTD) [Y] 5,7* abstract *; | [Y]US6024040 (THOMAS PIERRE-ARMAND [FR]) [Y] 5,7 * abstract *; | [Y] - "HYBRID PRODUCTION SYSTEMS DESIGNED FOR MARGINAL FIELDS", OFFSHORE, PENNWELL, TULSA, OK, US, (199101), vol. 51, no. 1, ISSN 0030-0608, page 46,48, XP000174821 [Y] 1-5,7,8,14,16,17,25-27 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821029), vol. 006, no. 216, Database accession no. (M - 168), & JP57121993 A 19820729 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO KK) [Y] 5,7,25 * the whole document * | International search | [X]GB2081782 (HOULDER OFFSHORE LTD); | [YP]US6196767 (THOMAS PIERRE-ARMAND [FR]); | [Y]GB2079826 (COYNE & BELLIER); | [A]US4907912 (SMITH MARVIN L [US]); | [A]US4266887 (CORDER PAUL R) | by applicant | US5609442 |