EP1331871 - EDGE CLEANING APPARATUS FOR A VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Change - representative | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oreck Holdings, LLC 100 Plantation Road New Orleans, LA 70123 / US | [2003/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Terrance, M. 1795 Berry Lane Fayetteville, AR 72701 / US | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Law Limited First Floor Unit 5 The Courtyard Wixford Park, Bidford on Avon Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Law Limited First Floor Unit 5 The Courtyard Wixford Park Bidford on Avon Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB | ||
Former [2011/19] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen Henley-in-Arden B95 6HJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen Warwickshire, B95 6HJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Lane, Michael John, et al Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen Warwickshire B95 6HJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/32] | Bibby, William Mark, et al Mathisen, Macara & Co., The Coach House, 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01977909.9 | 05.10.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001US42514 | Priority number, date | US20000708311 | 07.11.2000 Original published format: US 708311 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238023 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331871 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/02, A47L9/04 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
A47L9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANTENREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN STAUBSAUGER | [2003/32] | English: | EDGE CLEANING APPARATUS FOR A VACUUM CLEANER | [2003/32] | French: | APPAREIL POUR NETTOYER LES BORDS POUR ASPIRATEUR | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1992238 (ROSE GEORGE L); | [Y]FR860549 (ELECTROLUX AB) [Y] 1-7,15-19 * page 1, lines 1-14,28-51 * * page 2, lines 21-28,33-39,46-77 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]US3225379 (CUMMINS CHARLES R); | [A]US3950815 (FUKUCHI AKINORI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4397058 (KOLAND DAVID G) [Y] 1-7,15-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0576174 (REXAIR INC [US]) [A] 1,15 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, lines 13-33,49-59 * * column 6, lines 11-19 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 27 * * column 7, lines 42-55 * * figures 1-4,8-11 * | International search | [X]US2226371 (CARLSON VERNON E); | [X]US1965614 (SELLERS WILLIAM D); | [X]US2590152 (MCGOWAN JOHN F); | [X]US2607069 (HAHN PAUL T); | [X]US3040365 (GERBER DALE C); | [X]US3597789 (BOYD WILTON E); | [X]US3608333 (SELLEY WILBUR-WEBB, et al); | [A]USRE28022E ; | [A]US4685170 (AHLF HEINZ-JUERGEN [DE], et al) |