EP1325079 - PLASTIC PRODUCTS COMPRISING BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTER BLEND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUTRAN, Jean-Philippe, Marie 217 Hillcrest Drive Wyoming, OH 45215 / US | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/41] |
Former [2004/33] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/28] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 01977915.6 | 05.10.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001US42523 | Priority number, date | US20000238599P | 06.10.2000 Original published format: US 238599 P | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0228969 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1325079 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1325079 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/04, C08L67/02, // C08L67:04, C08L67:02, C08L67:02, C08L67:04 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/04, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C08L67/04, C08L67/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFGEGENSTÄNDE AUS BIOABBAUBAREM POLYESTER MISCHZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2003/28] | English: | PLASTIC PRODUCTS COMPRISING BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTER BLEND COMPOSITIONS | [2003/28] | French: | PRODUITS PLASTIQUES CONTENANT DES COMPOSITIONS DE MELANGES DE POLYESTER BIODEGRADABLES | [2003/28] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 30.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.12.2005 | BE | 21.12.2005 | CH | 21.12.2005 | CY | 21.12.2005 | FI | 21.12.2005 | LI | 21.12.2005 | TR | 21.12.2005 | DK | 21.03.2006 | GR | 21.03.2006 | SE | 21.03.2006 | ES | 01.04.2006 | PT | 22.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
TR | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
IT | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
BE | 21.12.2005 | ||
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 21.12.2005 | |
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 21.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9923161 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 1-10* page 1, line 1 - line 7; claims 1-19 * |