EP1251782 - REMOTE THUMBWHEEL FOR A SURGICAL BIOPSY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242-2839 / US | [2002/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRISON, William, A. 491 Maple Circle Dr. Springdale, NJ 45246 / US | 02 /
STEPHENS, Randy, R. 5699 Lake Michigan Drive Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01977925.5 | 09.10.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001US42543 | Priority number, date | US20000240492P | 13.10.2000 Original published format: US 240492 P | US20010967253 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 967253 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0230269 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251782 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251782 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
A61B10/0266 (EP,US);
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0208 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00455 (EP,US);
A61B2090/376 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTFERNTES DAUMENRAD FÜR EIN CHIRURGISCHES BIOPSIEGERÄT | [2002/44] | English: | REMOTE THUMBWHEEL FOR A SURGICAL BIOPSY DEVICE | [2002/44] | French: | MOLETTE DISTANTE POUR DISPOSITIF DE BIOPSIE CHIRURGICALE | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 26.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07005024.0 / EP1787589 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5649547 (RITCHART MARK A [US], et al) [DA] 1,2 * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 46 *; | [DA]US6007497 (HUITEMA THOMAS W [US]) [DA] 1,2 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 61 *; | [DA]US6086544 (HIBNER JOHN A [US], et al) [DA] 1,2* column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 22 * | International search | [X]US5980469 ; | [A]US5769086 |