EP1355620 - DENTAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boots Company PLC 1 Thane Road West Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | For all designated states The University Of Sheffield Firth Court Western Bank Sheffield S10 2TN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states The Boots Company PLC 1 Thane Road West Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | ||
For all designated states The University Of Sheffield Firth Court, Western Bank Sheffield, S10 2TN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Yue, Hugh, c/o University of Sheffield School of Dentistry, Claremont Crescent Sheffield, South Yorkshire S10 2TA / GB | 02 /
LILLEY, Terence, Henry 451 Greystones Road Sheffield, South Yorkshire S11 7BY / GB | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01978267.1 | 25.07.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001EP08606 | Priority number, date | GB20000018227 | 26.07.2000 Original published format: GB 0018227 | GB20010008815 | 09.04.2001 Original published format: GB 0108815 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0207691 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355620 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/90 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/594 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAHNZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2003/44] | English: | DENTAL COMPOSITIONS | [2003/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DENTAIRE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2003 | 31.07.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5252246 (DING SHULIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9850005 (MEDLOGIC GLOBAL CORP [US]) [X] 1 * example 9; claim 1; table 2 *; | [A]US4537778 (CLIPPER DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 32 - line 45; claim 1 *; | [A]US5096698 (MITCHELL ROBERT L [GB], et al) [A] 1 * example 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5928628 (PELLICO MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1; tables I,II,III *; | [PA]WO0050005 (DONG WHA PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [PA] 1 * claims 1,2 * |