EP1317582 - METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE POSITION OF A SLAB CONSTRUCTION CONSISTING OF PRECAST CONCRETE SLABS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/24] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CORRECTING THE POSITION OF A SLAB CONSTRUCTION CONSISTING OF PRECAST CONCRETE SLABS | ||
[2006/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max Bögl Bauunternehmung GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 11 20 92301 Neumarkt / DE | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHEL, Dieter Badstrasse 13 92318 Neumarkt / DE | 02 /
BÖGL, Stefan Winnbergerstrasse 44 92369 Sengenthal / DE | 03 /
SCHREINER, Ulrike Müchnerstrasse 51c 82178 Puchheim / DE | 04 /
LINDNER, Erich Brunnäcker 7 91275 Auerbach-Nasnitz / DE | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01978280.4 | 18.08.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001EP09544 | Priority number, date | DE2000145327 | 12.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10045327 | DE2000164748 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064748 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0222957 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317582 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317582 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E01B29/04 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
E01B29/04 (EP,US);
E01B2204/06 (EP,US);
E01B2204/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 13.02.2003 | LV | 13.02.2003 | MK | 13.02.2003 | RO | 13.02.2003 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LAGEKORREKTUR EINER PLATTENKONSTRUKTION AUS BETONFERTIGTEILPLATTEN | [2006/18] | English: | METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE POSITION OF A SLAB CONSTRUCTION CONSISTING OF PRECAST CONCRETE SLABS | [2006/18] | French: | PROCEDE POUR CORRIGER LA POSITION D'UN CONSTRUCTION REALISEE A PARTIR DE PLAQUES PREFABRIQUEES EN BETON | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/24] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LAGEKORREKTUR EINER PLATTENKONSTRUKTION AUS BETONFERTIGTEILPLATTEN | ||
Former [2003/24] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CORRECTING THE POSITION OF A SLAB CONSTRUCTION CONSISTING OF PRECAST CONCRETE SLABS | ||
Former [2003/24] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CORRIGER LA POSITION D'UN CONSTRUCTION REALISEE A PARTIR DE PLAQUES PREFABRIQUEES EN BETON | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | FR | 18.10.2006 | GB | 18.10.2006 | IE | 18.10.2006 | IT | 18.10.2006 | NL | 18.10.2006 | TR | 18.10.2006 | DK | 18.01.2007 | SE | 18.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | ES | 29.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
FR | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
FR | 18.10.2006 | ||
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
GB | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 18.10.2006 | |
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 18.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19733909 (BOEGL MAX BAUUNTERNEHMUNG GMBH [DE]) [A] 8,10* column 4, paragraph 2; figure 8 *; | [XA]DE19848655 (ZUEBLIN AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,10,13,14,16,21-23 * abstract * * column 4, line 5 - line 18 * * column 4, line 25 - line 40 * * column 3, line 45 - line 62 * * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 4 * [A] 7,20 |