EP1318938 - TRACTOR WITH FRONT SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWMAN, Dennis, Aaron 1016 Tremont Street Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | 02 /
SCHAFER, Christopher, Alan 911 Mill Street Traer, IA 50675 / US | 03 /
JEFFRIES, Dennis, Lee 9842 Dysart Road Waterloo, IA 50701 / US | 04 /
BROWN, Jeffrey, Kahle 5111 Cedar Heights Drive Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Lau-Loskill, Philipp, et al Deere & Company European Office Steubenstrasse 34-62 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Lau-Loskill, Philipp, Dipl.-Phys., et al Deere & Company, European Office, Steubenstrasse 34-62 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01978321.6 | 30.08.2001 | [2003/25] | WO2001EP09993 | Priority number, date | US20000661855 | 14.09.2000 Original published format: US 661855 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0222427 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1318938 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318938 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/18 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
F01M11/0004 (EP,US);
B60G3/18 (EP,US);
B60G3/20 (EP,US);
B60G7/02 (EP,US);
B60K17/16 (EP,US);
B62D7/18 (EP,US);
B60G2200/144 (EP,US);
B60G2200/422 (EP,US);
B60G2200/44 (EP,US);
B60G2204/143 (EP,US);
B60G2204/147 (EP,US);
B60G2204/19 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/25] | Title | German: | TRAKTOR MIT VORDERRADAUFHÄNGUNG | [2003/25] | English: | TRACTOR WITH FRONT SUSPENSION | [2003/25] | French: | TRACTEUR A SUSPENSION AVANT | [2003/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 10.02.2004 | Observations by third parties | 19.03.2004 | Observations by third parties | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 26.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06100904.9 / EP1650108 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | ES | 17.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/20] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | NL | 06.09.2006 | |
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 06.09.2006 | |
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | SE | 06.12.2006 | |
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | SE | 06.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63258206 ; | [X]US2901051 (THIBODEAU JOHN L) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 56 - line 60 * * column 6, line 40 - line 45 * * column 7, line 44 - line 45 * * column 8, line 10 * * column 10, line 47 - line 75 *; | [X]US3283842 (WATT ANDREW K) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 6 - line 19 *; | [A]DE19952313 (TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE INC [US]) [A] 1* figures 3,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890207), vol. 013, no. 052, Database accession no. (M - 794), & JP63258206 A 19881025 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | other | FR878464 | US5538274 | US6138786 | EP0807543 |