EP1330309 - CATALYST SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CARBONYLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFER, Martin Kastanienweg 18 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 02 /
SLANY, Michael Römerstrasse 12 67281 Kirchheim / DE | 03 /
ZELLER, Edgar Sophienstrasse 10 68165 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
RÖPER, Michael Pegauer Strasse 10 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 05 /
SCHULZ, Michael Am Kirschberg 34 67550 Worms / DE | 06 /
GRIMM, Günther Giselherplatz 71 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2003/31] | Application number, filing date | 01978386.9 | 25.09.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001EP11052 | Priority number, date | DE20001048874 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10048874 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0226382 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1330309 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330309 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/16, C07C51/14, C07C67/38 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
B01J31/2404 (EP,US);
B01J31/02 (KR);
B01J31/165 (EP,US);
B01J31/2419 (EP,US);
C07C51/14 (EP,US);
C07C67/38 (EP,US);
B01J2231/321 (EP,US);
B01J2531/824 (EP,US);
B01J31/24 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/14, C07C53/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATORSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR CARBONYLIERUNG | [2003/31] | English: | CATALYST SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CARBONYLATION | [2003/31] | French: | SYSTEME CATALYSEUR ET PROCEDE DE CARBONYLATION | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2005 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 16.02.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2007
ADMISSIBLE Lucite International UK Limited Queens Gate, 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire S014 3BP / GB Opponent's representative Walsh, David Patrick Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2007
ADMISSIBLE Lucite International UK Limited Queens Gate, 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire S014 3BP / GB Opponent's representative Walsh, David Patrick Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | 08.05.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.11.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.06.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/48] | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 08.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.04.2006 | IE | 05.04.2006 | TR | 05.04.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | AT | 25.09.2006 | LU | 25.09.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | IE | 05.04.2006 | |
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
AT | 25.09.2006 | ||
LU | 25.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | IE | 05.04.2006 | |
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
AT | 25.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | IE | 05.04.2006 | |
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
AT | 25.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | IE | 05.04.2006 | |
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | IE | 05.04.2006 | |
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | IE | 05.04.2006 | |
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | DK | 05.07.2006 | |
PT | 05.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4127506 (GRAY HARRY B, et al); | [X]EP0008407 (HEYL CHEM PHARM [DE]); | [DA]EP0441446 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [PX]WO0110551 (INEOS ACRYLICS UK LTD [GB], et al) |