EP1330307 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE INTEGRATED SYNTHESIS AND ANALYSIS OF ANALYTES ON A SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states febit biotech GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 515 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states Febit Biotech GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 515 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Febit AG Käfertalerstrasse 190 68167 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÄHLER, Cord, F. Gässelweg 15 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
GÜIMIL, Ramon Otto-Hahn-Platz 7 69126 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
SCHEFFLER, Matthias Ladenburgstr. 22 69493 Hirschberg/Leutershausen / DE | 04 /
STÄHLER, Peer, F. Riedfeldstrasse 3 68169 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
HEIDBREDE, Anke Stresemannstrasse 15 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2003/35] |
Former [2003/31] | 01 /
STÄHLER, Cord, F. Siegfriedstrasse 9 69469 Weinheim / DE | ||
02 /
GÜIMIL, Ramon Otto-Hahn-Platz 7 69126 Heidelberg / DE | |||
03 /
SCHEFFLER, Matthias Stahlbühlring 77 68526 Ladenburg / DE | |||
04 /
STÄHLER, Peer, F. Riedfeldstrasse 3 68169 Mannheim / DE | |||
05 /
HEIDBREDE, Anke Stresemannstrasse 15 68165 Mannheim / DE | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01978431.3 | 17.10.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001EP12027 | Priority number, date | DE2000151396 | 17.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10051396 | US20000240793P | 17.10.2000 Original published format: US 240793 P | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0232567 | Date: | 25.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1330307 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330307 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1330307 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00279 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00466 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00468 (EP,US);
B01J2219/005 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0054 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0059 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00648 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00657 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00702 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00711 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00725 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTEGRIERTEN SYNTHESE UND ANALYTBESTIMMUNG AN EINEM TRÄGER | [2003/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE INTEGRATED SYNTHESIS AND ANALYSIS OF ANALYTES ON A SUPPORT | [2003/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR EFFECTUER UNE SYNTHESE INTEGREE ET UNE DETERMINATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE A ANALYSER SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 10.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Request for further processing for: | 22.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.09.2005 | FR | 07.09.2005 | IE | 07.09.2005 | IT | 07.09.2005 | NL | 07.09.2005 | TR | 07.09.2005 | AT | 17.10.2005 | CY | 17.10.2005 | BE | 31.10.2005 | CH | 31.10.2005 | LI | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | LU | 07.11.2005 | DK | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | SE | 07.12.2005 | ES | 18.12.2005 | PT | 07.02.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
IT | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 17.10.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
FR | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
IT | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 17.10.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 17.10.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
CY | 17.10.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
BE | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 31.10.2005 | ||
LI | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SE | 07.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9853093 (BIOARRAY SOLUTIONS LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO9960170 (HYSEQ INC [US]) [X] 17 * abstract * * page 6, line 28 - page 8, line 15 * * page 9, line 11 - line 20 * * figure - *; | [DA]WO0013017 (FEBIT FERRARIUS BIOTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-30 * abstract *; | [DA]WO0013018 (FEBIT FERRARIUS BIOTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-30* abstract *; | [XA]DE19910392 (INST PHYSIKALISCHE HOCHTECH EV [DE]) [X] 16,19,20,27 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - line 54 * * column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 2 * * figures 3-6 * [A] 1-15,17,18 |