EP1360443 - AIR CONDITIONER AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-Dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City Kyungki-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City Kyungki-do 442-742 / KR | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jong Youb 110-1903, LG Samik APT, 377,Homaesil-Dong, Kwonsun-Gu 441-450 Suwon-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | [2008/15] |
Former [2003/46] | 01 /
KIM, Jong Youb 110-1903, LG Samik APT, 377,Homaesil-Dong, Kwonsun 441-450 Suwon-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01979045.0 | 18.10.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001KR01758 | Priority number, date | KR20010007736 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: KR 2001007736 | KR20010030830 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: KR 2001030830 | [2003/46] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02066902 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1360443 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1360443 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, F25B49/02 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
F24F11/83 (EP,US);
F24F11/86 (EP,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0261 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2521 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | F24F11/00 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/15] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2003/46] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME | [2003/46] | French: | CLIMATISEUR ET SON PROCEDE DE COMMANDE | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2002 | Translation filed | 28.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 19.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5022234 (GOUBEAUX RONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1,13* column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0982497 (COPELAND CORP [US]) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figures 2,3 * | International search | [A]KR990075671 ; | [A]US6047557 (PHAM HUNG M [US], et al); | [A]KR20000020087 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) |