EP1343894 - AOPB GENE, PROTEIN, HOMOLOGS, FRAGMENTS AND VARIANTS THEREOF, AND THEIR USE FOR CELL SURFACE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The National University of Singapore 10 Kent Ridge Crescent Singapore 119260 / SG | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Shen, Quan 107 Clementi Road 06-02 Singapore 129790 / SG | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2003/38] | Johnstone, Helen Margaret Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01979215.9 | 01.11.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001SG00228 | Priority number, date | US20000244902P | 02.11.2000 Original published format: US 244902 P | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0236777 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1343894 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C07K14/415 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AOPB-GEN, -PROTEIN, HOMOLOGE, FRAGMENTE UND VARIANTEN DAVON UND IHRE VERWENDUNG BEI DER ZELLOBERFLÄCHENPRÄSENTATION | [2003/38] | English: | AOPB GENE, PROTEIN, HOMOLOGS, FRAGMENTS AND VARIANTS THEREOF, AND THEIR USE FOR CELL SURFACE DISPLAY | [2003/38] | French: | GENE AOPB, PROTEINE, HOMOLOGUES, FRAGMENTS ET VARIANTS DE CELUI-CI, AINSI QUE L'UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS POUR PRESENTATION A LA SURFACE CELLULAIRE | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 09.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |