EP1328438 - VARIABLE EDGE ROTOR BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diversified Technologies, Inc. 35 Wiggins Avenue Bedford, MA 01730-2345 / US | [2003/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINK, David, Allen 85 Laurel Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | 02 /
GAUDREAU, Marcel, Joseph, Pierre 151 Grove Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 01979274.6 | 21.09.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US29749 | Priority number, date | US20000234594P | 22.09.2000 Original published format: US 234594 P | US20010294127P | 29.05.2001 Original published format: US 294127 P | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0224526 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1328438 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B64C11/28 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
B64C3/44 (EP,US);
B64C27/473 (EP,US);
B64C27/615 (EP,US);
B64C27/68 (EP,US);
B64C3/50 (EP,US);
B64C2027/7266 (EP,US);
Y02T50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÄUFERSCHAUFEL MIT VARIABLER KANTE | [2003/30] | English: | VARIABLE EDGE ROTOR BLADE | [2003/30] | French: | PALE DE ROTOR A BORD VARIABLE | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 04.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3093350 (TIMOTHY WILKINS CHARLES) [X] 1,20,32 * column 1, line 69 - column 2, line 71; figure - *; | [X]US4230295 (EPPLER RICHARD) [X] 1,20,32* column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10; figure - *; | [X]US4361299 (SHARROCK BARRY) [X] 1-45 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 21; figure - *; | [X]WO9105699 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US]) [X] 1-45 * page 9, line 2 - page 11, line 14; figure - * | International search | [X]US5320491 (COLEMAN CLINT [US], et al); | [X]US5626312 (HEAD ROBERT E [US]); | [X]US5224826 (HALL STEVEN R [US], et al); | [A]US4189121 (HARPER PHILIP M [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9105699 |