EP1415160 - WHOLE CELL ENGINEERING BY MUTAGENIZING A SUBSTANTIAL PORTION OF A STARTING GENOME, COMBINING MUTATIONS, AND OPTIONALLY REPEATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verenium Corporation 4955 Directors Place San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/36] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states DIVERSA CORPORATION 4955 Directors Place San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHORT, Jay, M. P.O. Box 7214 Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067-7214 / US | 02 /
FU, Pengcheng 7588 Charmant Drive 1914 San Diego, CA 92122-5079 / US | 03 /
LATTERICH, Martin 12539 Motellano Terrace San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
WEI, Jing 10725 Wexford St. 6 San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 05 /
LEVIN, Michael 7565 Tupelo Cove San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01979431.2 | 01.10.2001 | [2004/19] | WO2001US31004 | Priority number, date | US20000677584 | 30.09.2000 Original published format: US 677584 | US20010279702P | 28.03.2001 Original published format: US 279702 P | WO2001US19367 | 14.06.2001 Original published format: PCT/US01/19367 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0229032 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415160 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C12N15/82, C12N15/10 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/1027 (EP,US);
C12N15/1058 (EP,US);
C12N15/8241 (EP,US);
G01N33/534 (EP,US);
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION GANZER ZELLEN DURCH MUTAGENESE EINES WESENTLICHEN ANTEILS EINES AUSGANGSGENOMS, KOMBINATION VON MUTATIONEN UND GEGEBENFALLS WIEDERHOLUNG | [2004/19] | English: | WHOLE CELL ENGINEERING BY MUTAGENIZING A SUBSTANTIAL PORTION OF A STARTING GENOME, COMBINING MUTATIONS, AND OPTIONALLY REPEATING | [2004/19] | French: | MANIPULATION DE CELLULE ENTIERE PAR MUTAGENESE D'UNE PARTIE SUBSTANTIELLE D'UN GENOME DE DEPART, PAR COMBINAISON DE MUTATIONS ET EVENTUELLEMENT PAR REPETITION | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 01.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.01.2004 | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0011208 (UNIV WASHINGTON) [XD] 1-52,66-72 * page 9, paragraphs 2,3 - page 10, paragraph 1; claims 1-19,43 * * claims 20-41 * [X] 53-65; | [XD] - GYGI S P ET AL, "QUANTITATIVE ANALYSIS OF COMPLEX PROTEIN MIXTURES USING ISOTOPE-CODED AFFINITY TAGS", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (199910), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 994 - 999, XP001010578 [XD] 1-72 * page 994, column R - page 996, column L; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/13690 | [A] - SHEVCHENKO A ET AL, "Rapid 'de Novo' Peptide Sequencing by a Combination of Nanoelectrospray, Isotopic Labeling and a Quadrupole/Time-of-Flight Mass Spectrometer", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY, HEYDEN, LONDON, GB, (1997), vol. 11, ISSN 0951-4198, pages 1015 - 1024, XP002101143 [A] 1-72 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0231(19970615)11:9<1015::AID-RCM958>3.0.CO;2-H | [A] - JI J ET AL, "Strategy for qualitative and quantitative analysis in proteomics based on signature peptides", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY. BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000804), vol. 745, no. 1, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 197 - 210, XP004215299 [A] 1-72 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00192-4 | [A] - ODA Y ET AL, "ACCURATE QUANTITATION OF PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND SITE-SPECIFIC PHOSPHORYLATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199906), vol. 96, no. 12, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6591 - 6596, XP001080471 [A] 1-72 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.12.6591 |