EP1329002 - SURFACE MOUNT CONNECTOR LEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEARLS, Damion 6355 NE Brighton Street Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | 02 /
DISHONGH, Terrance 6934 SW Reedville Circle Drive Hillsboro, OR 97123 / US | 03 /
DUJARI, Prateek 1511 SW Park Avenue, Apt. 217 Portland, OR 97201 / US | 04 /
LIAN, Bin 14823 NW Vance Drive Portland, OR 97229 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | HGF, et al Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Harrison Goddard Foote, et al Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2006/18] | Harrison Goddard Foote, et al Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2004/10] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2003/30] | Molyneaux, Martyn William Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn London WC2A 2AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01979711.7 | 12.10.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US31815 | Priority number, date | US20000698898 | 27.10.2000 Original published format: US 698898 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0235655 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329002 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329002 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/36, H01R4/02, H05K3/34 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
H01R12/57 (EP,KR,US);
H01R12/707 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/3426 (EP,KR,US);
H01R12/7011 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMONTIERTE VERBINDERANSCHLÜSSEN | [2003/30] | English: | SURFACE MOUNT CONNECTOR LEAD | [2003/30] | French: | CONDUCTEUR DE CONNECTEUR A MONTAGE EN SURFACE | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2008 | BE | 06.08.2008 | CY | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | IT | 06.08.2008 | NL | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | IE | 12.10.2008 | LU | 12.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | FR | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | GB | 06.11.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | ES | 17.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | DE | 01.05.2009 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
CY | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
TR | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 12.10.2008 | ||
LU | 12.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
GB | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
CY | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 12.10.2008 | ||
LU | 12.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
GB | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 12.10.2008 | ||
LU | 12.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
GB | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 12.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
GB | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 12.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
GB | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 12.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 12.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
DE | 01.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 06.08.2008 | |
ES | 17.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5411236 (MORITA SHIGEHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 2,8,15,19* column 4, line 5 - column 17; figures 9,10 *; | [A]GB2325354 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 3,9,16,20 * page 5, line 15 - line 30; figure 4 *; | [YA]US5910885 (GULACHENSKI ALAN M [US], et al) [Y] 13,19 * column 5, line 31 - line 67; figures 5A-6 * [A] 1-12,14-18,20-22; | [XY]EP0954066 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12,14-16,18,20,22 * page 2, column 2, line 17 - page 3, column 3, line 6; figure 6 * [Y] 5,11,13,17,19,21; | [Y]US6083045 (CHIU ALLEN [TW]) [Y] 5,11,17,21 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 17; figures 2,3 * |