EP1341585 - BIOPOLYMER THICKENED FIRE RETARDANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICL Performance Products LP 622 Emerson Road, Suite 500 St. Louis, MO 63141-1160 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states ICL Performance Products LP 622 Emerson Road, Suite 500 St. Louis MO 63141-1160 / US | ||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states ASTARIS LLC 622 Emerson Road Suite 500 St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | ||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states ASTARIS LLC 622 Emerson Road Suite 500 St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDERSALL, Howard, L. 2137 Albright Avenue Upland, CA 91784-1258 / US | 02 /
KEGELER, Gary, H. 1773 "B" South Diamond Bar Boulevard Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2003/37] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01979835.4 | 16.10.2001 | [2003/37] | WO2001US32203 | Priority number, date | US20000253387P | 28.11.2000 Original published format: US 253387 P | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0243813 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1341585 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1341585 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A62D1/00, C09K21/14 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
C09K21/04 (EP,US);
A62D1/0035 (EP,US);
C09K21/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR [2004/22] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOPOLYMERVERDICKTE FEUERHEMMENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2003/37] | English: | BIOPOLYMER THICKENED FIRE RETARDANT COMPOSITIONS | [2003/37] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'IGNIFUGATION EPAISSIES AUX BIOPOLYMERES | [2003/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 16.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4822524 (STRICKLAND BRUCE G [US]) [A] 1-6,16,17,19-21,37-42,47-49 * the whole document * |