EP1320887 - MAKING OF FUSES AND ANTIFUSES WITH A VERTICAL DRAM PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qimonda AG Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 212 81739 München / DE | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2012/29] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies North America Corp. 1730 North First Street San Jose, CA 95112-4508 / US | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIVAKARUNI, Rama 60 Sherwood Avenue Ossining, NY 10562 / US | 02 /
RADENS, Carl 35 Kuchler Drive LaGrangeville, NY 12540 / US | 03 /
NESBIT, Larry 24 Fawn Drive Farmington, CT 06032 / US | 04 /
BERGNER, Wolfgang 70 Stagecoach Pass Stormville, NY 12582 / US | [2003/40] |
Former [2003/26] | 01 /
DIVAKARUNI, Rama 219 Verkman Drive Middletown, NY 10941 / US | ||
02 /
RADENS, Carl 35 Kuchler Drive LaGrangeville, NY 12540 / US | |||
03 /
NESBIT, Larry 24 Fawn Drive Farmington, CT 06032 / US | |||
04 /
BERGNER, Wolfgang 70 Stagecoach Pass Stormville, NY 12582 / US | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01979899.0 | 25.09.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001US42293 | Priority number, date | US20000675246 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: US 675246 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0227784 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320887 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L23/525 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H01L23/5252 (EP,US);
H01L21/82 (KR);
H10B12/038 (EP,US);
H01L23/5256 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SCHMELZSICHERUNGEN UND ANTISCHMELZSICHERUNGEN MIT EINEM PROZESS FÜR VERTIKALE DRAMS | [2003/26] | English: | MAKING OF FUSES AND ANTIFUSES WITH A VERTICAL DRAM PROCESS | [2003/26] | French: | STRUCTURE ET PROC D POUR FUSIBLES ET ANTIFUSIBLES SEMI-CONDUCTEURS DE DRAMS VERTICALES | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 18.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   19.02.2010 | 30.09.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5110754 (LOWREY TYLER A [US], et al) [A] 1-11,20-25 * column W *; | [Y]EP0905783 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]US5976943 (MANLEY MARTIN HAROLD [US], et al) [A] 12-19,26-30* column W *; | [A]DE19845004 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [Y]US6096580 (IYER S SUNDAR KUMAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * column W * | Examination | EP0241046 | DE19817749 |