EP1327092 - PRESSURE RELEASE BURSTING DISC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goddard, John Process Equipment Inc., 4400 South Service Road Burlington Ontario L7L 5R8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Goddard, John Process Equipment Inc., 4400 South Service Road Burlington, Ontario L7L 5R8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Boyce, Conor, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Boyce, Conor, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2003/29] | Boyce, Conor, et al F.R. Kelly & Co, 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge, Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01980065.5 | 02.10.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001CA01411 | Priority number, date | CA20002321939 | 02.10.2000 Original published format: CA 2321939 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0229296 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327092 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/16 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
F16K17/1613 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IE [2004/22] |
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKENTLASTUNGSBERSTSCHEIBE | [2003/29] | English: | PRESSURE RELEASE BURSTING DISC | [2003/29] | French: | DISQUE DE DECOMPRESSION DE SURETE | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 01.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/08] | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2093527 (IMI MARSTON LTD) [X] 1-10,16-23 * page 1, line 77 - page 2, line 16; figures 1-3 * [Y] 11-13; | [Y]US4691729 (CLIFT MINER E [US]) [Y] 11-13 * column 4, line 29 - line 47; figure 4 *; | [XY]US5570803 (FARWELL STEPHEN P [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,16-23 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 29; figures 1,2 * [Y] 11-13; | [PA]US6220269 (MUDDIMAN G SCOTT [CA], et al) [PA] 1,7,11-13* column W * |