EP1338696 - BELT FOR PAPERMAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/35] | BELT FOR PAPERMAKING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PAPERMAKING BELT | ||
[2006/15] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Opposition rejected | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAUCHI CORPORATION 2-7, Shodai-tajika Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/36] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states YAMAUCHI CORPORATION 7,2-chome, Shodai-tajika Hirakata Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Atsuo c/o YAMAUCHI CORPORATION 2-7, Shodai-tajika Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1132 / JP | 02 /
HIKIDA, Takahisa c/o YAMAUCHI CORPORATION 2-7, Shodai-tajika Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1132 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Atsushi c/o YAMAUCHI CORPORATION 2-7, Shodai-tajika Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1132 / JP | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Jörg Peter Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Hoffmann, Jörg Peter, Dr. Ing. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01981017.5 | 07.11.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001JP09757 | Priority number, date | JP20000343712 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000343712 | [2003/51] |
Former [2003/35] | JP20030043712 | 10.11.2000 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238859 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1338696 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1338696 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1338696 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/48, D21F3/02 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
D21F3/0227 (EP,US);
D21F7/08 (KR);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/3808 (EP,US);
C08G18/3868 (EP,US);
C08G18/4854 (EP,US);
D21F3/0236 (EP,US);
Y10S162/901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2041 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2066 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2098 (EP,US);
Y10T442/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3814 (US,EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3868 (EP,US);
C08G18/10, C08G18/6685 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/35] | D21F3/00, C08G18/10, C08G18/65 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRESSBAND FÜR PAPIERHERSTELLUNG | [2006/15] | English: | BELT FOR PAPERMAKING | [2006/15] | French: | COURROIE DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER | [2006/15] |
Former [2003/35] | PRESSBAND FÜR PAPIERHERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2003/35] | BELT FOR PAPERMAKING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PAPERMAKING BELT | ||
Former [2003/35] | COURROIE DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2003 | Translation filed | 22.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 24.03.2004 | Observations by third parties | 08.06.2004 | Observations by third parties | 16.02.2005 | Observations by third parties | 09.03.2005 | Observations by third parties | 04.04.2005 | Observations by third parties | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06006150.4 / EP1688446 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.2007
28.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Ichikawa Co., Ltd. 14-15 Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.2007
28.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Ichikawa Co., Ltd. 14-15 Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.2007
28.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Ichikawa Co., Ltd. 14-15 Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP Opponent's representative Hansen, Bernd, et al, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 D-81925 München / DE | 27.07.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.01.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.12.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.01.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/21] | Appeal following opposition | 30.01.2009 | Appeal received No. T0303/09 | 31.03.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.01.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 17.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.01.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2006 | BE | 20.09.2006 | CH | 20.09.2006 | CY | 20.09.2006 | LI | 20.09.2006 | NL | 20.09.2006 | TR | 20.09.2006 | IE | 07.11.2006 | LU | 07.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | GB | 20.12.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | PT | 12.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
TR | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 07.11.2006 | ||
LU | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
LI | 20.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH04119191 (YAMAUCHI CORP); | [A]EP0509460 (YAMAUCHI CORP [JP]); | [A]WO9742246 (UNIROYAL CHEM CO INC [US]); | [A]WO9914426 (SCAPA GROUP PLC [GB], et al); | [A]EP0939162 (ICHIKAWA CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0960975 (ALBANY INT CORP [US]); | [A]EP1033380 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) | other | JP4119191K | JPH06200496 | JPH10298893 | US5895806 | US6086719 | - BECK R.A., TRUSS R.W., "The effect of curative on the fracture toughness of PTMEG/TDI polyurethane elastomers", POLYMER, (199502), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 767 - 774, XP004025959 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(95)93106-V | - BECK R.A., TRUSS R.W., "The effect of stoichiometry on the fracture toughness of a polyurethane-urea elastomer", POLYMER, (199901), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 307 - 313, XP004139671 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(98)00245-6 | - BECK R.A., TRUSS R.W., "Effect of chemical structure on the wear behaviour of polyurethane-urea elastomers", WEAR, (1998), vol. 218, pages 145 - 152, XP002988345 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0043-1648(98)00219-1 | - SIMON J.H. ET AL., "Studies of an aromatic diamine in MDI systems", POLYURETHANE MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, BUFFALO, NEW YORK (ETHYL CHEMICALS GROUP), (19881024), pages 1 - 16, XP002988346 | - NALEPA C.J. ET AL., "A new curative for cast elastomers", J OF ELASTOMERS AND PLASTICS, (198804), vol. 20, pages 128 - 142, XP002988347 | - IWATA K., Polyurethane resin handbook, JAPAN, THE JAPAN INDUSTRIAL JOURNAL, (19870925), page 33, ISBN 4-526-02234-9, XP002988348 | - SINGH A. ET AL., "Recent developments in high performance castable elastomers", UTECH ASIA '95, (1995), vol. 43, pages 1 - 9, XP002988349 |