EP1432303 - FARROWING DEVICE FOR A SOW WITH PIGLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nooyen Roosters B.V. Fabrieksstraat 12 5753 AH Deurne / NL | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOOYEN, Antonius, Maria, Aloysius Steenovenstraat 16 B-3941 Hechtel-Eksel / BE | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Dorna, Peter, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Dorna, Peter, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01981170.2 | 12.10.2001 | [2004/27] | WO2001NL00753 | Priority number, date | NL20001016397 | 13.10.2000 Original published format: NL 1016397 | [2004/27] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0230179 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1432303 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1432303 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/02 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
A01K1/0218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | ABFERKELBUCHT FÜR EIN MUTTERSCHWEIN MIT FERKEL | [2004/27] | English: | FARROWING DEVICE FOR A SOW WITH PIGLETS | [2004/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE BAS POUR UNE TRUIE AVEC DES PORCELETS | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2001 | Translation filed | 14.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 12.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.07.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.07.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   14.07.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2005 | CH | 20.07.2005 | FI | 20.07.2005 | FR | 20.07.2005 | IT | 20.07.2005 | LI | 20.07.2005 | TR | 20.07.2005 | CY | 12.10.2005 | IE | 12.10.2005 | DK | 20.10.2005 | GB | 20.10.2005 | GR | 20.10.2005 | SE | 20.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | PT | 21.12.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IT | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
FR | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IT | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XD]GB2026832 (WALES A G) [XD] 1,9 * page 4, lines 14-24; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE8625686U (FRIEDRICH) [A] 1,8,10,12* page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13; figures 1-3 * | Examination | DE3842731 | by applicant | US4793287 |