EP1334317 - ADJUSTABLE VALVE FOR VARIABLE FLOWS AND A METHOD FOR REDUCING FLOW THROUGH A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindinvent AB S:t Lars Väg 44B 227 70 Lund / SE | [2003/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBORG, Herman Grubbes väg 9 S-240 10 Dalby / SE | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Lindberg, Olle Nils Olof, et al Albihns.Zacco Studentgatan 4 Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | Lindberg, Olle Nils Olof, et al Albihns Malmö AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 01981226.2 | 26.10.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001SE02359 | Priority number, date | SE20000003886 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: SE 0003886 | SE20000004146 | 14.11.2000 Original published format: SE 0004146 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0235157 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1334317 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1334317 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/10, F24F13/06, F24F11/04, F24F13/24, F16K3/24 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
A62C2/20 (EP);
F16K1/123 (EP);
F24F11/75 (EP);
F24F13/10 (EP);
F24F11/35 (EP);
F24F2013/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARES VENTIL FÜR VERÄNDERLICHE STRÖME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG EINES STROMS DURCH EIN VENTIL | [2003/33] | English: | ADJUSTABLE VALVE FOR VARIABLE FLOWS AND A METHOD FOR REDUCING FLOW THROUGH A VALVE | [2003/33] | French: | CLAPET REGLABLE DESTINE A DES ECOULEMENTS VARIABLES ET PROCEDE DE REDUCTION D'UN ECOULEMENT PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UN CLAPET | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 04.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.06.2006 | IT | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | LU | 26.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | IT | 07.06.2006 | |
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
LU | 26.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | IT | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | IT | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XP]JP2001221475 ; | [X]GB553283 (EUGENE CHAUDOIR, et al); | [X]GB1493608 (DEMAG AG); | [X]US4397223 (MAXSON DALE E); | [X]SE442669 (IFM AKUSTIKBYRAN AB [SE]); | [X]US5154666 (WAPNER DANIEL [US]); | [X]SE500402 (MARKARYDS METALLARMATUR AB [SE]); | [X]WO9718419 (PHOENIX CONTROLS CORP [US]); | [A]SE513616 (HALTON OY [FI]); | [XP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 72, Database accession no. 2001-620569, XP002953205 & JP2001221475 A 20010817 (GEMMEL, G.) |