EP1362412 - QUADRATURE FREQUENCY CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2003/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHOTA, Gurkanwal, S. 3560 Curlew Street San Diego, CA 92103 / US | 02 /
GARD, Kevin 11693 Springside Road San Diego, CA 92128 / US | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Reedy, Orlaith, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2013/03] |
Former [2003/47] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01981455.7 | 09.10.2001 | [2003/47] | WO2001US31695 | Priority number, date | US20000686267 | 10.10.2000 Original published format: US 686267 | [2003/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0231962 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1362412 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362412 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03B21/01, H03D7/16 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
H03B21/01 (EP);
H03D7/165 (EP);
H04L27/34 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2003/47] | H03C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | QUADRATUR FREQUENZUMSETZER | [2003/47] | English: | QUADRATURE FREQUENCY CONVERTER | [2003/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET CIRCUIT POUVANT PRODUIRE DES SINUSOIDES DESTINEES A DES MODULATEURS ET DES CONVERTISSEURS DE FREQUENCE | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | IE | 09.10.2013 | LU | 09.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
IE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6029059 (BOJER JORGEN [US]) [X] 1-5,14-17,23-27,29,30,35,37,39,40 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 62; figures 2,3 *; | [XA]JPH08256187 ; | [A]EP0903846 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,22,35,38,39 * column 4, line 48 - column 9, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5412351 (NYSTROM CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [DA] 1,26,29,35,39 * figure 1 *; | [DA]US5942929 (APARIN VLADIMIR [US]) [DA] 1,26,29,35,39 * figures 2-5 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08256187 A 19961001 (FUJITSU LTD;FUJITSU VLSI LTD) [X] 1,4-9,19,20,29,31-36 * abstract * [A] 26,28 | by applicant | US6029059 |