EP1326555 - SELECTIVELY THINNED COILED-SHEET STENTS AND METHODS FOR MAKING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endotex Interventional Systems, Inc. 10231 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROURKE, Jonathan, M. 2185 Chuleta Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
YANG, Yi 2394 45th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/29] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01981481.3 | 05.10.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001US31795 | Priority number, date | US20000693334 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: US 693334 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0234162 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1326555 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1326555 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
A61F2/92 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0036 (EP,US);
Y10S623/901 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Title | German: | SELEKTIV VERDÜNNTE, AUS EINER FOLIE GEWICKELTE STENTS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2010/45] | English: | SELECTIVELY THINNED COILED-SHEET STENTS AND METHODS FOR MAKING THEM | [2003/29] | French: | STENTS DU TYPE RUBAN SPIRALE, AMINCIS DE MANIERE SELECTIVE, ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ASSOCIES | [2003/29] |
Former [2003/29] | SELEKTIV VERDÜNNTE, AUS EINEM BOGEN GEWICKELTE STENTS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 14.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | GB | 05.10.2011 | LU | 05.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 05.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 05.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 05.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR2764794 (NYCOMED LAB SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,11,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 4,10,16; | [A]EP0951877 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 1,6,7,9,10,12,14-16 * paragraph [0017]; figure - * * paragraph [0021] *; | [A]WO0028921 (ENDOTEX INTERVENTIONAL SYS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,7-9,13-15* figure -; claims 21,50-53 *; | [A]EP1042997 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 1,9,16 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figure - *; | [PXA]WO0100112 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [PX] 1,2,6,7,9-12,14,15 * page 16, line 27 - page 17, line 7; figure 9; claim - * [A] 4,16,18 | by applicant | US4577631 | US5007926 | US5158548 | US5423885 | US5441515 | US5443500 |