EP1360793 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING THE SECURITY OF DIGITAL SIGNATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IT Security Solutions LLC 1812 Riggs Place, N.W. Washington, DC 20009 / US | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Steven, B. 1812 Riggs Place, N.W. Washington, DC 20009 / US | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Strachan, Victoria Jane Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Strachan, Victoria Jane Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Alexandra House, 1 Alexandra Road Swansea SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 01981795.6 | 24.10.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001US32624 | Priority number, date | US20000242458P | 24.10.2000 Original published format: US 242458 P | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0235764 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1360793 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2153 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SICHERHEIT DIGITALER UNTERSCHRIFTEN | [2003/46] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING THE SECURITY OF DIGITAL SIGNATURES | [2003/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LA SECURITE DES SIGNATURES NUMERIQUES ET DES INFRASTRUCTURES A CLES PUBLIQUES POUR DES APPLICATIONS DU MONDE REEL | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 03.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/45] | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2004 | 31.10.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5191613 (GRAZIANO JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1,16,20,28,29 * column 2, line 7 - column 14, line 6; figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP0676877 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-29 * page 3, line 51 - page 7, line 55; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0760565 (FELDBAU OFRA [IL]) [X] 1,16,20,28,29 * page 3, line 57 - page 9, line 53; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO9712460 (DOCUMENT AUTHENTICATION SYSTEM [US]) [A] 1,16,20,28,29 * page 7, line 14 - page 19, line 4; figures 1-7 *; | [XA]WO9908415 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9-29 * page 3, line 13 - page 6, line 26; figure 1 * [A] 7,8; | [A]WO9933221 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,16,20,28,29 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 28 * * page 5, line 7 - page 10, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6021202 (ANDERSON MILTON [US], et al) [A] 1,16,20,28,29 * column 10, line 37 - column 16, line 6 ** column 18, line 11 - column 31, line 10; figures 1-9 *; | [X]FR2791203 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMS & SERVICE [FR]) [X] 1-29 * page 3, line 27 - page 12, line 9; figures 1,2 * |