EP1335843 - DEVICE FOR VEHICLE LIGHTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDEL, Edgar Hudlerstrasse 25 89250 Senden / DE | [2003/34] | Application number, filing date | 01982463.0 | 06.11.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001EP12810 | Priority number, date | DE2000155462 | 09.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055462 | [2003/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238413 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335843 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335843 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/04, B60Q1/52, G01S7/499 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
B60Q1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/34] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR FAHRZEUGBELEUCHTUNG | [2003/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR VEHICLE LIGHTING | [2003/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ECLAIRAGE DE VEHICULES | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 13.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | IE | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 13.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB302656 (BOREL) [X] 1,14 * figure 66 *; | [A]DE4107850 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,14* abstract *; | [X]US5582480 (ZWICK HUBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,14 * column A; figure 2 *; | [X]US5930055 (EISENBERG YESHAYAHU S [IL]) [X] 1,14 * column A; figures 5,6,8 * | by applicant | DE4007646 |