EP1335736 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atheromastat PTY LTD. Level 11, BGC Centre Perth, WA 6000 / AU | [2003/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANG, Gerald 4/25 Billyard Avenue Elizabeth Bay, NSW 2011 / AU | 02 /
CONWAY, Patricia 20 Goorawahl Avenue La Perouse, NSW 2036 / AU | 03 /
CLANCY, Robert VRI BioMedical Limited Level 4 David Madison Bld. Newcastle, NSW 2300 / AU | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01982630.4 | 25.10.2001 | [2003/34] | WO2001IB02005 | Priority number, date | AU2000PR01016 | 25.10.2000 Original published format: AU PR101600 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0234273 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335736 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/72, A61K35/74, A61P29/00, A61P9/00 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
A61K35/74 (KR);
A61K35/741 (EP,US);
A61K35/745 (EP,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
A61K36/062 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/741, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/745, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/747, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/062, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2003/34] | A61K35/74, A61P9/00, C12Q1/00, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON HERZ-KREISLAUF-ERKRANKUNGEN | [2003/34] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR DISORDERS | [2003/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES CARDIO-VASCULAIRES | [2003/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 22.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 11.06.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2252044 (UNIV LONDON [GB]) [Y] 1-40 * claims 1-12 *; | [Y]JPH10139674 (YAKULT HONSHA KK) [Y] 1-40 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9826790 (STANFORD ROOK LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-40 * page 6, line 5 - line 23 *; | [PY]WO0166124 (MEDINNOVA SF [NO], et al) [PY] 1-40 * page 1, line 6 - line 9 * * page 10, line 6 - line 34 * * claims 1-23 *; | [L]WO03090776 (ATHEROMASTAT PTY LTD [AU], et al) [L] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [Y] - LAMAN J D ET AL, "CD40-CD40L interactions in atherosclerosis", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19970601), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0167-5699, pages 272 - 277, XP004068295 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-5699(97)80022-9 | [A] - STEMME S ET AL, "T lymphocytes from human atherosclerotic plaques recognize oxidized low density lipoprotein.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. UNITED STATES 25 APR 1995, (19950425), vol. 92, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3893 - 3897, XP002277281 [A] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.9.3893 | International search | [X]JPH10229841 ; | [X]JPH10139674 ; | [X]WO9907827 (PROBI AB [SE], et al); | [X]WO9949877 (GANEDEN BIOTECH INC [US], et al); | [X]WO0029007 (REDDY MALIREDDY S [US]); | [X]US6100098 (NEWKIRK MARIANNA M [CA]); | [X] - KEREN P. ET AL, "Effect of hyperglycemia and hyperlipidemia on atherosclerosis in LDL receptor deficient mice", DIABETES, (200006), vol. 49, pages 1064 - 1069, XP002974065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.49.6.1064 | [X] - LEE T.S. ET AL, "The role of interleukin 12 in the development of atherosclerosis in ApoE-deficient mice", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 19, pages 734 - 742, XP002974064 | [X] - OXMAN T. ET AL, "A new method of long-term preventive cardioprotection using lactobacillus", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HEART AND CIRCULATORY PHYSIOLOGY, (200005), vol. 278, pages HI717 - HI724, XP002974063 | [X] - TAYLOR G.R.J. AND WILLIAMS C.M., "Effects of probiotics on blood lipids", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1998), vol. 80, SUPPL. 2, pages S225 - S230, XP002974516 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 45, Database accession no. 1998-524249, XP002228892 & JPH10229841 A 19980902 (YAKULT HONSHA KK) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 31, Database accession no. 1998-357417, XP002238081 & JPH10139674 A 19980526 (YAKULT HONSHA KK) | [X] - FROSTEGARD J. ET AL, "Cytokine expression in advanced human atherosclerotic plaques: dominance of pro-inflammatory (Th1) and macrophage-stimulating cytokines", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1999), vol. 145, pages 33 - 43, XP000994998 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9150(99)00011-8 | [X] - MACH F. ET AL, "Differential expression of three T lymphocyte-activating CXC chemokines by human atheroma-associated cells", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1999), vol. 104, no. 8, pages 1041 - 1050, XP002974066 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI6993 | [X] - ZHOU X. ET AL, "Hypercholesterolemia is associated with a T helper (Th) 1/Th2 switch of the autoimmune response in atherosclerotic apo E-knockout mice", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1998), vol. 101, no. 8, pages 1717 - 1725, XP002233261 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI1216 | [X] - KAHAN T. ET AL, "Greater than normal prevalence of seropositivity for helicobacter pylori among patients who have suffered myocardial infarction", CORONARY ARTERY DISEASE, (200010), vol. 11, no. 7, pages 523 - 526, XP002974515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00019501-200010000-00002 | [X] - KORNER, I. ET AL, "Serological evidence of chlamydia pneumoniae lipopolysaccharide antibodies in atherosclerosis of various vascular regions", VASA, (1999), vol. 28, pages 259 - 263, XP002974517 |