EP1332159 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF LATENT ANTITHROMBIN III [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Octapharma AG Seidenstrasse 2 8853 Lachen / CH | [2003/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARLSSON, Göran Björnidegränd 103 S-162 46 Vällingby / SE | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01983012.4 | 08.11.2001 | [2003/32] | WO2001SE02473 | Priority number, date | SE20000004086 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: SE 0004086 | US20000252148P | 20.11.2000 Original published format: US 252148 P | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238610 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1332159 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/81, A61K38/55 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP);
C07K14/81 (KR);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 07.05.2003 | LV | 07.05.2003 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 07.05.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LATENTEM ANTITHROMBIN III | [2003/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF LATENT ANTITHROMBIN III | [2003/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ANTITHROMBINE III LATENTE | [2003/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP] - GORAN KARLSSON ET AL., "Separation of native and latent forms of human antithrombin by hydrophobic interaction high-performance liquid chromatography", EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (2001), vol. 21, pages 149 - 155, XP002909963 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.2000.1349 | [A] - MARK R. WARDELL ET AL., "Preparative induction and characterization of L-antithrombin: a structural homologue of latent plasminogen activation inhibitor-1", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 13133 - 13142, XP002909962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi970664u |