EP1345749 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR EXTRUDING A TUBULAR FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rasmussen, Ole-Bendt Sagenstrasse 12 6318 Walchwil / CH | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01983566.9 | 15.10.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001EP12430 | Priority number, date | GB20000031720 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: GB 0031720 | WO2001EP04885 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: PCT/EP01/04885 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02051617 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345749 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345749 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/06, B29C47/20, B29C47/28 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A23G3/2015 (EP,US);
A21C11/163 (EP);
A23G9/285 (EP);
A23P30/25 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/2556 (EP,US);
B29C48/307 (EP,US);
B29C48/31 (EP,US);
B29C48/313 (EP,US);
B29C48/32 (EP,US);
B29C48/325 (EP,US);
B29C48/335 (EP,US);
B29C48/3363 (EP,US);
B29C48/338 (EP,US);
B29C48/475 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EXTRUDIEREN EINER SCHLAUCHFOLIE | [2003/39] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR EXTRUDING A TUBULAR FILM | [2003/39] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL D'EXTRUSION D'UN FILM TUBULAIRE | [2004/44] |
Former [2003/39] | PROC D S ET APPAREIL D'EXTRUSION D'UN FILM TUBULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 15.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Request for further processing for: | 17.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.08.2005 | BE | 17.08.2005 | CH | 17.08.2005 | FI | 17.08.2005 | FR | 17.08.2005 | IT | 17.08.2005 | LI | 17.08.2005 | NL | 17.08.2005 | TR | 17.08.2005 | CY | 15.10.2005 | IE | 17.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | DK | 17.11.2005 | GB | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | DE | 18.11.2005 | ES | 28.11.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
CY | 15.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
FR | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GB | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
CY | 15.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GB | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
CY | 15.10.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GB | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GB | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
DE | 18.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
BE | 17.08.2005 | ||
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CH | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
ES | 28.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3581344 (SEDERLUND EDWARD R, et al) [A] 1,11-15,19,21-24,36,46-50,54,56-59 * the whole document *; | [DXA]GB1384979 (FARRELL J J) [DX] 32,66 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 39 - line 44 * * column 7, line 36 - line 57 * * claim - * [A] 1-31,33-65,67-69; | [A]DE3934670 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1,10,11,17-20,36,46,54,55 * figure - *; | [DA]EP0626247 (BATTENFELD GLOUCESTER ENG [US]) [DA] 1-69 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0771641 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1,3,11,19,36,46,54* abstract *; | [DA]US5690972 (PLANETA MIREK [CA], et al) [DA] 1-69 * the whole document * |