EP1334088 - QUINOLINE-4-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS NK-3 AND NK-2 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline S.p.A. Via Alessandro Fleming, 2 37135 Verona / IT | For all designated states Laboratoire Glaxosmithkline S.A.S. 100, route de Versailles 78163 Marly-le-Roi Cedex / FR | [2003/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARINA, Carlo, Nikem Research S.r.l. Via Zambeletti, 25 I-20021 Baranzate / IT | 02 /
GIARDINA, Giuseppe, Nikem Research S.r.l. Via Zambletti, 25 I-20021 Baranzate / IT | 03 /
GRUGNI, Mario, Nikem Research S.r.l. Via Zambelett, 25 I-20021 Baranzate / IT | 04 /
NADLER, Guy Margue. Marie Gerard, Glaxosmithkline 100 route de Versailles F-78163 Marly-le-Roi Cedex / FR | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Rutter, Keith GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | Rutter, Keith GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01983584.2 | 12.11.2001 | [2003/33] | WO2001EP13141 | Priority number, date | GB20000027701 | 13.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0027701 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0238548 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1334088 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/52, A61K31/47, A61K31/4709, A61P11/06 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
C07D215/52 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHINOLIN-4-CARBOXAMIDDERIVATE ALS NK-3 UND NK-2 REZEPTOR ANTAGONISTEN | [2003/33] | English: | QUINOLINE-4-CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS NK-3 AND NK-2 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS | [2003/33] | French: | DERIVES DE QUINOLINE-4-CARBOXAMIDE UTILISES COMME ANTAGONISTES DE RECEPTEURS DE NK-3 ET NK-2 | [2003/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0031037 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM SPA [IT], et al) [XD] 1-13 * examples 90,91; claim 13 * |