EP1370591 - ACTIVE NON-METALLOCENE PRE-CATALYST AND METHOD FOR TACTIC CATALYTIC POLYMERIZATION OF ALPHA-OLEFIN MONOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. Haim Levanon Street 32, P.O. Box 39296 61392 Tel Aviv / IL | [2006/31] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. Haim Levanon Street 32, P.O. Box 39296 61392 Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOL, Moshe 59 Jerusalem Boulevard 52371 Ramat Gan / IL | 02 /
TSHUVA, Edit 10 Bustenay Street 76289 Rehovot / IL | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 01983754.1 | 06.11.2001 | [2003/51] | WO2001IL01029 | Priority number, date | US20000705780 | 06.11.2000 Original published format: US 705780 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0236638 | Date: | 10.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1370591 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370591 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C07C215/50, C07F7/00 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C07C215/50 (EP,US);
C07F7/00 (EP,US);
C07F7/003 (EP,US);
C08F110/14 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
Y10S526/905 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/64189 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/659 (EP,US);
C08F110/14, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/15 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/51] | C08F4/16, C08F4/44, C08F10/04, C08F110/04, C08F210/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVER NICHTMETALLOCEN-PRÄKATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR TAKTISCHEN KATALYTISCHEN POLYMERISATION VON ALPHA-OLEFIN-MONOMEREN | [2003/51] | English: | ACTIVE NON-METALLOCENE PRE-CATALYST AND METHOD FOR TACTIC CATALYTIC POLYMERIZATION OF ALPHA-OLEFIN MONOMERS | [2003/51] | French: | PRECATALYSEUR ACTIF NON METALLOCENE POUR POLYMERISATION CATALYTIQUE TACTIQUE DE MONOMERES ALPHA-OLEFINIQUES | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 15.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | FR | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | IE | 06.11.2006 | LU | 06.11.2006 | ES | 13.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
LU | 06.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5852146 (REICHLE WALTER THOMAS [US], et al) [DA] 1-57 * the whole document *; | [DPA]WO0118010 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al) [DPA] 1-57 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1218386 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al)[E] 1-57; | [X] - HINSHAW C J ET AL, "Molybdenum(VI)-dioxo complexes with linear and tripodal tetradentate ligands: models for the molybdenum(VI/V) centers of the molybdenum hydroxylases and related enzymes 1. Syntheses and structures", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 28, no. 25, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 4483 - 4496, XP002935342 [X] 1-3,7-11,13-15 * complexes 1-5 *; page 4485; tables I,,II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00324a012 | [DA] - BRINTZINGER H H ET AL, "Stereospecific olefin polymerization with chiral metallocene catalysts", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (1995), vol. 34, ISSN 0570-0833, pages 1143 - 1170, XP000877111 [DA] 1-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.199511431 | [DA] - BAUMANN R ET AL, "Synthesis of titanium and zirconium complexes that contain the tridentate diamido ligand, [((t-Bu-d6)N-o-C6H4)2O](2-) ([NON](2-)) and the living polymerization of 1-hexene by activated [NON]ZrMe2", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19970602), vol. 119, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3830 - 3831, XP002062057 [DA] 1-57 * the whole document * | [DA] - SCOLLARD J D ET AL, "Living polymerization of alpha-olefins by chelating diamide complexs of titanium", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1996), vol. 118, no. 41, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 1008 - 1009, XP000913902 [DA] 1-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9618964 | [DA] - LINDEN VAN DER A ET AL, "Polymerization of alpha-olefins and butadiene and catalytic cyclotrimerization of 1-alkynes by a new class of group IV catalysts. Control of molecular weight and polymer microstructure via ligand tuning in sterically hindered chelating phenoxide titanium and zirconium species", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1995), vol. 117, no. 11, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3008 - 3021, XP000887019 [DA] 1-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00116a006 | [DA] - JAYARATNE K C ET SITA L R, "Stereospecific living Ziegler-Natta polymerisation of 1-hexene", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20000209), vol. 122, no. 5, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 958 - 9, XP002269881 [DA] 1-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja993808w | [DA] - JEON Y-M ET AL, "Zirconium complexes with the new ancillary diamido ligand 2,2'-ethylenebis(N,N'-(triisopropylsilyl) anilido)(2-): syntheses, structures, and living alpha-olefin polymerisation catalysts", ORGANOMETALLICS, (19980720), vol. 17, no. 15, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 3161 - 3, XP002269882 [DA] 1-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om980249d | [A] - BANDOLI G ET AL, "Preparation and crystal and molecular structure of [N,N'-o-phenylene-bis(salicylideneiminato)UO2(EtOH)]", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, SECTION D, (1971), pages 1330 - 1331, XP009025789 [A] 1-57 * the whole document * | [A] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, (19910226), Database accession no. 3869282 (BRN), XP002270891 [A] 1-57 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5707913 (SCHLUND RUEGER [DE], et al); | [Y]US5889128 (SCHROCK RICHARD R [US], et al); | [Y] - VOLKIS ET AL., "Pressure modulates stereoregularities in the polymerization of propylene promoted by rac-octahedral heteroallylic complexes organometallics", (1998), vol. 17, pages 3155 - 3157, XP002939901 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om980335d | [Y] - AVERBUJ ET AL., "Stereoregular polymerization of alpha-olefins catalyzed by chiral group 4 benzamidinate complexes of C1 and C3 symmetry", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 120, pages 8640 - 8646, XP000863771 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja980392y | [Y] - HERSKOVICS ET AL., "Bis(trimethylsilyl) benzamidinate zirconium dichlorides. active catalysts for ethylene polymerization JOMC", (1995), vol. 503, pages 307 - 314, XP004023639 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-328X(95)05576-B |